Nunez v. Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Juan S Nunez
Defendant: Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc. and John Does 1-10
Case Number: 1:2022cv00332
Filed: May 2, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Robert C Brack
Referring Judge: Laura Fashing
2 Judge: Carmen E Garza
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 29, 2022 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc. re First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production to Plaintiff Juan S. Nunez (Collins, Jill)
June 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing granting #20 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Added attorney Elizabeth Perkins for Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc. Attorney Dominic B. Romero terminated. (cda)
June 16, 2022 Filing 20 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and to Substitute Counsel by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.. (Collins, Jill)
June 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER SETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. Settlement Conference set for 11/9/2022 at 09:00 AM remote via Zoom before Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. (cda)
June 13, 2022 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc. re Defendant's Rule 26 Initial Disclosures (Collins, Jill)
June 9, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE of Hearing: Jury Selection and Trial set for 06/26/2023, through 06/29/2023, (approximately four (4) days), at 09:00 AM in Las Cruces - 320 Tortugas Courtroom (North Tower)- before Sr. District Judge Robert C. Brack. (ao)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
June 9, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE of Hearing: Final Pretrial Conference set for 05/25/2023, at 08:30 AM, in Las Cruces - 320 Tortugas Courtroom (North Tower) - before Sr. District Judge Robert C. Brack. (Counsel may appear telephonically for all Pretrial Conferences by using ATT Conference Number: 888-557-8511; and Access Code: 8270258. Please call Judge Brack's Chambers two (2) weeks prior to your scheduled hearing indicating your preference to appear telephonically). (ao)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
June 9, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of Hearing: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 04/27/2023, at 08:30 AM, in Las Cruces - 320 Tortugas Courtroom (North Tower) - before Sr. District Judge Robert C. Brack. (Counsel may appear telephonically for all Pretrial Conferences by using ATT Conference Number: 888-557-8511; and Access Code: 8270258. Please call Judge Brack's Chambers two (2) weeks prior to your scheduled hearing indicating your preference to appear telephonically). (ao)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
June 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER ADOPTING JOINT STATUS REPORT AND PROVISIONAL DISCOVERY PLAN and SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. Discovery due by 12/15/2022. Motions due by 1/24/2023. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 3/24/2023. (cda)
June 8, 2022 Filing 12 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing: Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference held on 6/8/2022. (cda)
June 7, 2022 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Juan S Nunez of Initial Disclosures (Grayson, Brian)
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing granting #9 Motion to Extend Deadline to Submit Initial Disclosures. (cda)
June 1, 2022 Filing 9 Joint MOTION to Extend (other) Deadline to Submit Initial Rule 26 Disclosures by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order) (Romero, Dominic)
June 1, 2022 Filing 8 Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc. (Romero, Dominic)
May 25, 2022 Filing 7 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to Sr. District Judge Robert C. Brack as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
May 25, 2022 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc. (Collins, Jill)
May 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference set for 6/8/2022 at 02:30 PM in Albuquerque - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan due by 6/1/2022. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 5/24/2022. (ccp)
May 2, 2022 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.. (Collins, Jill)
May 2, 2022 Filing 3 Transmittal of State Court Documents by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc. (Collins, Jill)
May 2, 2022 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
May 2, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc. from Second Judicial District, case number D-202-CV-2022-01112. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Complaint, #3 Exhibit State of Delaware Corporation Entity Search)(Collins, Jill)
May 2, 2022 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-8248654 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Collins, Jill)
May 2, 2022 United States Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza and United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing assigned. (dr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nunez v. Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan S Nunez
Represented By: Brian G. Grayson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.
Represented By: Dominic B. Romero
Represented By: Jill M Collins
Represented By: Elizabeth Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?