Green et al v. Laguna Development Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Barry Green and Feliz Rael
Defendant: Laguna Development Corporation d/b/a Route 66 Casino Hotel, Edward Khader, Adrian Fox, Jesse Orozco, Lucas Lee, State of New Mexico, New Mexico Department of Transportation, FCA US LLC, Laguna Development Corporation doing business as Route 66 Casino Hotel and Estate of Lucas Lee
Case Number: 1:2022cv00343
Filed: May 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: James O Browning
Referring Judge: Laura Fashing
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2022 Filing 23 RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 MOTION to Remand filed by Laguna Development Corporation. (Peterson, David)
June 17, 2022 Filing 22 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Laguna Development Corporation (Peterson, David)
June 16, 2022 Filing 21 NOTICE by Barry Green re #4 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Laguna Development Corporation's Opposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply to Plaintiffs' Response in Opposition to Amended Rule 1-012(B)(1) Motion to Dismiss for Lack Plaintiffs Notice of Withdrawal of Opposition to Defendant Laguna Developments Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply in Support of Defendants Motion to Dismiss [DOC. 4] (DeLara, Christopher)
June 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by District Judge James O. Browning: Joint Status Report due by 7/15/2022. Scheduling Conference set for 7/19/2022 at 02:30 PM in Albuquerque - 460 Vermejo Courtroom before District Judge James O. Browning. (cmm)
June 15, 2022 Filing 19 NOTICE of Motion Hearing on Laguna Development Corporation's Opposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply to Plaintiffs Response in Opposition to Amended Rule 1-012(B)(1) Motion to Dismiss For Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction by the Laguna Development Corporation Defendants #4 , Motion for Remand #15 scheduled for 7/19/2022 at 02:30 PM in Albuquerque - 460 Vermejo Courtroom before District Judge James O. Browning. Should a party wish to appear remotely for this hearing they shall notify the Court by filing a written notice no later than 7/15/2022 indicating the preferred method of attendance (via telephone, via Zoom or any other desired method). Upon receipt of notification that one or more of the party(ies) wishes to appear remotely via Zoom the Court will schedule the Zoom session and provide connectivity details to the parties through separate notice/communication. Absent notification as indicated above, the Court will presume an in-person appearance is intended and plan accordingly. (lr) [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
June 9, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE by Adrian Fox, Edward Khader, Laguna Development Corporation, Jesse Orozco re #15 MOTION to Remand Notice of Extension Regarding Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand (Peterson, David)
June 9, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE of Non-Response and Notice of Briefing Complete by Adrian Fox, Edward Khader, Laguna Development Corporation, Jesse Orozco re #4 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Laguna Development Corporation's Opposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply to Plaintiffs' Response in Opposition to Amended Rule 1-012(B)(1) Motion to Dismiss for Lack filed by Laguna Development Corporation, Edward Khader, Adrian Fox, Jesse Orozco (Peterson, David) Modified text on 6/10/2022 (cmm).
June 8, 2022 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #10 MOTION to Dismiss Motion to Dismiss or Stay by Laguna Development Corporation, Edward Khader, Adrian Fox, and Jesse Orozco Based on the Tribal Exhaustion Doctrine by Barry Green. (DeLara, Christopher)
May 31, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION to Remand by Barry Green. (DeLara, Christopher)
May 24, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Adrian Fox, Edward Khader, Laguna Development Corporation, Jesse Orozco re #4 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Laguna Development Corporation's Opposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply to Plaintiffs' Response in Opposition to Amended Rule 1-012(B)(1) Motion to Dismiss for Lack filed by Laguna Development Corporation, Edward Khader, Adrian Fox, Jesse Orozco (Peterson, David)
May 24, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE by Barry Green of Withdrawal of Counsel (Bienvenu, Rosalind)
May 24, 2022 Filing 12 **FILED IN ERROR** NOTICE by Barry Green of Withdrawal of Counsel (Bienvenu, Rosalind) Modified on 5/24/2022 (arp).
May 23, 2022 Filing 11 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Laguna Development Corporation's Opposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply to Plaintiffs' Response in Opposition to Amended Rule 1-012(B)(1) Motion to Dismiss for Lack Reply in Support of March 18, 2022 Amended Rule 1-012(B)(1) Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction by the Laguna Development Corporation Defendants filed by Adrian Fox, Edward Khader, Laguna Development Corporation, Jesse Orozco. (Peterson, David)
May 23, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss Motion to Dismiss or Stay by Laguna Development Corporation, Edward Khader, Adrian Fox, and Jesse Orozco Based on the Tribal Exhaustion Doctrine by Adrian Fox, Edward Khader, Laguna Development Corporation, Jesse Orozco. (Peterson, David)
May 23, 2022 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by FCA US LLC identifying Corporate Parent FCA North America Holdings LLC for FCA US LLC. (Garcia, Tomas)
May 20, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: No. 6. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bl)
May 18, 2022 Filing 7 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to District Judge James O. Browning as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
May 13, 2022 Filing 5 Transmittal of State Court Documents State Court Pleadings by Adrian Fox, Edward Khader, Laguna Development Corporation, Jesse Orozco (Peterson, David)
May 11, 2022 Filing 4 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Laguna Development Corporation's Opposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply to Plaintiffs' Response in Opposition to Amended Rule 1-012(B)(1) Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction by the Laguna Development Corporation Defendants by Adrian Fox, Edward Khader, Laguna Development Corporation, Jesse Orozco. (Peterson, David)
May 5, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Tomas J Garcia on behalf of FCA US LLC (Garcia, Tomas)
May 5, 2022 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
May 5, 2022 United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar and United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing assigned. (jg)
May 4, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Laguna Development Corporation d/b/a Route 66 Casino Hotel Notice of Removal from First Judicial District Court in Santa Fe County, case number D-101-CV-2022-00034. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Laguna Development Corporation d/b/a Route 66 Casino Hotel. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Peterson, David)
May 4, 2022 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-8253913 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Laguna Development Corporation d/b/a Route 66 Casino Hotel (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Peterson, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Green et al v. Laguna Development Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barry Green
Represented By: Caren I Friedman
Represented By: Christopher J DeLara
Represented By: Christopher J Supik
Represented By: David C Odegard
Represented By: E Todd Tracy
Represented By: Justin Ross Kaufman
Represented By: Rosalind Bienvenu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Feliz Rael
Represented By: Caren I Friedman
Represented By: Christopher J DeLara
Represented By: Christopher J Supik
Represented By: David C Odegard
Represented By: E Todd Tracy
Represented By: Justin Ross Kaufman
Represented By: Rosalind Bienvenu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laguna Development Corporation d/b/a Route 66 Casino Hotel
Represented By: David W. Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Khader
Represented By: David W. Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adrian Fox
Represented By: David W. Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jesse Orozco
Represented By: David W. Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lucas Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of New Mexico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Mexico Department of Transportation
Represented By: Philip Hunter Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Represented By: Tomas J Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laguna Development Corporation doing business as Route 66 Casino Hotel
Represented By: David W. Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of Lucas Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?