Moreno v. Devon Energy Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Jesus Moreno
Defendant: Devon Energy Corporation and Devon Energy Production Company, L.P.
Case Number: 1:2022cv00345
Filed: May 5, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Laura Fashing
Referring Judge: Jerry H Ritter
2 Judge: Margaret I Strickland
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 21, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Devon Energy Corporation re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Devon Energy Corporation (Folse, Parker)
June 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Devon Energy Production Company, L.P. re #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Devon Energy Production Company, L.P. (Folse, Parker)
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Devon Energy Corporation, Devon Energy Production Company, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 4) (Folse, Parker)
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Devon Energy Corporation, Devon Energy Production Company, L.P.. (Folse, Parker)
June 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: No. 8. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (kg)
June 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Jesus Moreno. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Wexler, Noah)
June 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Jesus Moreno. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 proposed order) (Wexler, Noah)
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to United States District Judge Margaret I. Strickland as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
May 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Devon Energy Corporation (Folse, Parker)
May 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE OF CONSENT SUBMISSION DEADLINE: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(2), the parties are reminded that a magistrate judge was assigned as the trial judge in this matter under 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties are advised that the Clerk will reassign this matter to a district judge as the trial judge no later than 10 days from the entry of this notice unless consents from all parties have been filed. The parties are free to withhold consent. If you have already entered your consent, you need not resubmit. (ccp)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
May 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Devon Energy Production Company, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Folse, Parker)
May 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Devon Energy Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3) (Folse, Parker)
May 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT re 6 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, Trenton A. Shelton by Jesus Moreno (Wexler, Noah)
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiff Jesus Moreno by Noah M. Wexler on behalf of: Trenton A. Shelton Arnold & Itkin LLP 6009 Memorial DriveHouston, Texas 77007 (713) 222-3800 Fax (713) 222-3850 tshelton@arnolditkin.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Wexler, Noah)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
May 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiff Jesus Moreno by Trenton Anderson Shelton (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Shelton, Trenton)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
May 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-8279139 re: # 5 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Jesus Moreno (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Shelton, Trenton)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter granting #3 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline to answer or file some other response is now extended to 5/25/2022. (cd)
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Other Response to Plaintiff's Complaint by Devon Energy Corporation, Devon Energy Production Company, L.P.. (Folse, Parker)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Devon Energy Production Company, L.P., Devon Energy Corporation from Santa Fe County, 1st Judicial District, case number D-101-CV-2022-00534. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Devon Energy Production Company, L.P., Devon Energy Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5)(Folse, Parker)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-8255037 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Devon Energy Production Company, L.P., Devon Energy Corporation (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Folse, Parker)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing and United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter assigned. (jg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moreno v. Devon Energy Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesus Moreno
Represented By: Noah M. Wexler
Represented By: Trenton Anderson Shelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Devon Energy Corporation
Represented By: Andrew J. Cloutier
Represented By: Parker B. Folse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Devon Energy Production Company, L.P.
Represented By: Andrew J. Cloutier
Represented By: Parker B. Folse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?