Riasati v. Salim et al
Plaintiff: Hamid Frank Riasati
Defendant: Danish Salim, Mohammad Salim, Ameer Bhimji and Rubina Salim
Case Number: 1:2022cv00358
Filed: May 9, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Laura Fashing
Referring Judge: Steven C Yarbrough
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel A White on behalf of Danish Salim, Mohammad Salim, Rubina Salim (White, Daniel)
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Hamid Frank Riasati re #4 Amended Complaint Certificate Of Service Of First Amended Complaint And Consent To Proceed Before Magistrate Judge Upon Danish Salim and Mohammad Salim (McGovern, John)
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT (Corrected Signature Page To Filed First Amended Complaint) against Hamid Frank Riasati., filed by Hamid Frank Riasati. (McGovern, John)
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Summons Issued on Amended Complaint as to Ameer Bhimji, Rubina Salim. (jg)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Hamid Frank Riasati re #1 Complaint, Summons Issued Certificate Of Service Of Summonses And Complaint Upon Danish Salim and Mohammad Salim (McGovern, John)
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT , First against All Defendants. adding Rubina Salim and Ameer Bhimji, Ameer Bhimji and Rubina Salim., filed by Hamid Frank Riasati. (McGovern, John)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Summons Issued as to Danish Salim, Mohammad Salim. (jg)
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 APPENDIX/SUPPLEMENT re #1 Complaint Civil Cover Sheet by Hamid Frank Riasati (McGovern, John)
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Hamid Frank Riasati. (McGovern, John)
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number BNMDC-8259807 re #1 Complaint filed by Hamid Frank Riasati (Payment made via Pay.gov)(McGovern, John)
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough and United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing assigned. (jg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Riasati v. Salim et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hamid Frank Riasati
Represented By: John M McGovern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danish Salim
Represented By: Daniel A White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mohammad Salim
Represented By: Daniel A White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ameer Bhimji
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rubina Salim
Represented By: Daniel A White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?