Nidiffer et al v. Lovato et al
Plaintiff: Thomas E. Nidiffer and Laurie-Lynn Francese
Defendant: David Lovato, Armando Campos and Zachary Sisemore
Case Number: 1:2022cv00374
Filed: May 13, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Kirtan Khalsa
Referring Judge: Jerry H Ritter
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter setting a Rule16 Scheduling Conference for 8/11/2022 at 01:00 PM in Albuquerque - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter. Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan due by 8/4/2022. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 7/22/2022. (mlt)
June 24, 2022 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Armando Campos, David Lovato, Zachary Sisemore. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Laurie-Lynn Francese, Thomas E. Nidiffer.(Vega, Laura)
June 24, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura K. Vega on behalf of All Defendants (Vega, Laura)
June 6, 2022 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Thomas E. Nidiffer. Zachary Sisemore served on 6/4/2022, answer due 6/27/2022. (dr)
June 6, 2022 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Thomas E. Nidiffer. Armando Campos served on 6/3/2022, answer due 6/24/2022. (dr)
June 6, 2022 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Thomas E. Nidiffer. David Lovato served on 6/3/2022, answer due 6/24/2022. (dr)
June 6, 2022 Filing 9 Request for Witness by Thomas E. Nidiffer (dr)
June 6, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION to Produce Discovery by Thomas E. Nidiffer. (dr)
June 2, 2022 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (bp)
May 31, 2022 Filing 7 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
May 31, 2022 United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa assigned. (jg)
May 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; granting #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Court will not order service of Summons and Complaint on Defendants at this time because Plaintiffs have not provided Defendants' addresses. The Court will order service if Plaintiffs file a motion for service which provides Defendants addresses. (mlt)
May 13, 2022 Filing 5 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter has been assigned for a 28 U.S.C. 1915 review. (jg)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
May 13, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Laurie-Lynn Francese. (jg)
May 13, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Thomas E. Nidiffer. (jg)
May 13, 2022 Filing 2 CM/ECF PRO SE NOTIFICATION FORM electing to receive notification via postal mail by Thomas E. Nidiffer (jg)
May 13, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Thomas E. Nidiffer, Laurie-Lynn Francese. (jg)
May 13, 2022 United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter assigned. (jg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nidiffer et al v. Lovato et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas E. Nidiffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laurie-Lynn Francese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Lovato
Represented By: Laura K. Vega
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Armando Campos
Represented By: Laura K. Vega
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zachary Sisemore
Represented By: Laura K. Vega
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?