Torres v. Grana et al
Plaintiff: Carlos Torres
Defendant: Mohamed Grana and JP Gomez Transport, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2022cv00377
Filed: May 16, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Kirtan Khalsa
Referring Judge: Steven C Yarbrough
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Carlos Torres Plaintiff's First Supplemental Disclosure Statement (Dominguez, Paul)
July 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. A Rule 16 Settlement Conference is set for 2/13/2023 at 09:30 AM via Zoom videoconferencing before Judge Khalsa. A Telephonic Pre-Settlement Status Conference is set for 2/2/2023 at 01:30 PM before Judge Khalsa. Counsel are to call Judge Khalsa's AT&T conference line at (877) 848-7030 and enter the code 7324132 to connect to the proceedings. Plaintiff's demand letter is due to Defendants by 1/20/2023. Defendants' counteroffer letter is due to Plaintiff by 1/30/2023. The parties' confidential position statements are due to the Court by 2/1/2023. (kmt)
July 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER ADOPTING JOINT STATUS REPORT AND PROVISIONAL DISCOVERY PLAN WITH CHANGES AND SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT DEADLINES by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. Plaintiff to seek leave to join and amend by 8/8/2022. Defendants to seek leave to join and amend by 8/22/2022. Plaintiff's expert disclosures due by 11/14/2022. Defendants' expert disclosures due by 12/23/2022. Discovery due by 2/9/2023. Discovery motions due by 3/1/2023. Pretrial motions due by 3/13/2023. Proposed Pretrial Order due from Plaintiff to Defendants by 6/12/2023 and from Defendants to the Court by 6/26/2023. (kmt)
July 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Minutes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa: Telephonic Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference held on 7/14/2022. (kmt)
July 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 NOTICE OF RULE 73 CONSENT Received by All Parties. Related documents: 19 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge, filed by Carlos Torres, 7 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge, filed by Mohamed Grana. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
July 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ERRATA re 7 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge, by Mohamed Grana, JP Gomez Transport, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Richards, Lance)
July 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Carlos Torres Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures (Dominguez, Paul)
July 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Carlos Torres voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Dominguez, Paul)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
July 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mohamed Grana, JP Gomez Transport, Inc. Initial Disclosures (Wilber, Lauren)
July 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Joint Status Report by Plaintiff and by Mohamed Grana, JP Gomez Transport, Inc. (Richards, Lance)
July 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by JP Gomez Transport, Inc. (Richards, Lance)
July 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Lance Dean Richards on behalf of JP Gomez Transport, Inc. (Richards, Lance)
July 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) JP Gomez Transport's Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint for Negligence by JP Gomez Transport, Inc.. (Richards, Lance)
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carlos Torres. JP Gomez Transport, Inc. served on 5/24/2022, answer due 6/14/2022. (Dominguez, Paul)
June 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 **FILED IN ERROR** CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Carlos Torres (Dominguez, Paul) Atty Modified on 6/17/2022 (dr).
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. Counsel are to meet and confer by 6/23/2022. The parties' Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan is due by 7/5/2022. A Telephonic Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference is set for 7/14/2022 at 09:30 AM before Judge Khalsa. Counsel are to call the Court's AT&T conference line at (877) 848-7030 and enter the code 7324132 to connect to the proceedings. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 7/7/2022. (kmt)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER QUASHING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND SETTING DEADLINE by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. The Court's Order to Show Cause (Doc. 8) is quashed. Any motion to remand on the basis of a defect other than lack of subject-matter jurisdiction must be made within 30 days after the filing of the Amended Notice of Removal (Doc. 9). (kmt)
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE by Mohamed Grana Amended Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (Richards, Lance)
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. By 5/24/2022, Defendant Grana shall either: (1) file an amended Notice of Removal that cures the deficiency identified in the Order; or, (2) show cause why this matter should not be remanded to state court for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction. (kmt)
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Mohamed Grana voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Richards, Lance)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 APPENDIX/SUPPLEMENT Civil Cover sheet by Mohamed Grana (Richards, Lance)
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Mohamed Grana (Richards, Lance)
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Lance Dean Richards on behalf of Mohamed Grana (Richards, Lance)
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Mohamed Grana. (Richards, Lance)
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Mohamed Grana from Eleventh Judicial District - McKinley County, case number D1113CV202200086. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Mohamed Grana. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Richards, Lance)
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-8271402 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Mohamed Grana (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Richards, Lance)
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough and United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa assigned. (dr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Torres v. Grana et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Torres
Represented By: Paul M Dominguez
Represented By: Ricardo F. Roybal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mohamed Grana
Represented By: Lauren Rae Wilber
Represented By: Lance Dean Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Gomez Transport, Inc.
Represented By: Lance Dean Richards
Represented By: Lauren Rae Wilber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?