Zheng v. Walker et al
Plaintiff: Danhui Zheng
Defendant: Richard Charles Walker, Grant Leasing, LLC, Dave Grant Hay Incorporated, Grant Trucking, LLC, Dave R Grant Companies and National Interstate Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2022cv00432
Filed: June 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Gregory B Wormuth
Referring Judge: Steven C Yarbrough
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2022 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Dave Grant Hay Incorporated, Grant Leasing, LLC, Grant Trucking, LLC, Richard Charles Walker Defendants' Initial Disclosures (Kraft, Charles)
July 27, 2022 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Danhui Zheng Plaintiff's Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures (Jackson, Wesley)
July 21, 2022 Filing 17 Joint Status Report by Dave Grant Hay Incorporated, Grant Leasing, LLC, Grant Trucking, LLC, Richard Charles Walker (Kraft, Charles)
July 8, 2022 Filing 16 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiff Danhui Zheng by Wesley Jackson on behalf of: Jessica N. Marshall Pacific Coast Trial Law Firm, APC 7380 Clairemont Mesa Blvd, Suite 200San Diego, CA 92111 (858) 952-1901 Fax (858) 333-4401 jessica@pacificlawoffice.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Jackson, Wesley)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
July 8, 2022 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-8355846 re: # 16 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Danhui Zheng (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Jackson, Wesley)
July 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth. The Telephonic Rule 16 Conference set for 8/4/22 is RESET for August 11, 2022, at 3:00 p.m. Counsel shall call Judge Wormuth's teleconference line at (877) 402-9753, access code 7578461, to connect to the proceedings. All other provisions of the Court's #5 Initial Scheduling Order remain in effect.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (emm)
June 24, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE by Dave Grant Hay Incorporated, Grant Leasing, LLC, Grant Trucking, LLC, Richard Charles Walker Amended Notice of Removal (Kraft, Charles)
June 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER TO AMEND NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. (kfo)
June 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough granting #10 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff's claims against Defendants Dave R Grant Companies and National Interstate Insurance Company are dismissed without prejudice. (kfo)
June 16, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE OF RULE 73 CONSENT Received by All Parties. Related documents: 9 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge,, filed by National Interstate Insurance Company, Dave Grant Hay Incorporated, Grant Leasing, LLC, Dave R Grant Companies, Grant Trucking, LLC, Richard Charles Walker, 8 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge, filed by Danhui Zheng. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
June 16, 2022 Filing 10 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Dave R Grant Companies and National Interstate Insurance Company Without Prejudice by Dave Grant Hay Incorporated, Dave R Grant Companies, Grant Leasing, LLC, Grant Trucking, LLC, National Interstate Insurance Company, Richard Charles Walker. (Kraft, Charles)
June 15, 2022 Filing 9 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Dave Grant Hay Incorporated, Dave R Grant Companies, Grant Leasing, LLC, Grant Trucking, LLC, National Interstate Insurance Company, Richard Charles Walker voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Kraft, Charles)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
June 15, 2022 Filing 8 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Danhui Zheng voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Jackson, Wesley)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
June 9, 2022 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Dave Grant Hay Incorporated, Grant Leasing, LLC, Grant Trucking, LLC (Kraft, Charles)
June 8, 2022 Filing 6 Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number ALB052682 (bp)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
June 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth. Joint Status Report due July 21, 2022. Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for August 4, 2022, at 3:00 PM. Parties shall call Judge Wormuth's teleconference line at (877) 402-9753, access code 7578461, to be connected to the proceedings. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 6/29/2022. (emm)
June 7, 2022 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Dave Grant Hay Incorporated, Dave R Grant Companies, Grant Leasing, LLC, Grant Trucking, LLC, National Interstate Insurance Company, Richard Charles Walker. (Kraft, Charles)
June 7, 2022 Filing 3 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
June 7, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles B. Kraft on behalf of All Defendants (Kraft, Charles)
June 7, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Second Judicial District Court, case number D-202-CV-202201727. ( Filing Fee - Deliver Payment), filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kraft, Charles)
June 7, 2022 United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough and United States Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth assigned. (jg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zheng v. Walker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danhui Zheng
Represented By: Jessica D Marshall
Represented By: Wesley Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Charles Walker
Represented By: Charles B. Kraft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grant Leasing, LLC
Represented By: Charles B. Kraft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dave Grant Hay Incorporated
Represented By: Charles B. Kraft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grant Trucking, LLC
Represented By: Charles B. Kraft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dave R Grant Companies
Represented By: Charles B. Kraft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Interstate Insurance Company
Represented By: Charles B. Kraft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?