Griego et al v. United States Forest Service
Plaintiff: Patrick Griego, Leo Pacheco, Annabelle Pacheco, Adelaido Trujillo, Generose Trujillo, Juan Ortiz, Mary Ortiz, Samantha Ortiz, Anita Ortiz, Steven Franken, Pamela Abreu, Jim Abreu, Jonathan Miglin, Robert Bowden, Elizabeth Childers, Childers Burns, Clark Burns, Edna Burns, Loretta Chavez, Robert Chavez, Daniel Encinias, Lori Anne Encinias, Elizabeth Esquibel, Mark Esquibel, Cynthia Hollis, Walter Hughes, Sharron Hughes, Alexander Kwan, Fiachna Rose, Erica Larsen, Tyler White, Herman Lujan, Lorraine Lujan, Theodore Lujan, Lorenzo Lujan, Dennis Rivera, Felicia Rivera, Martin Sandoval, Donata Sena, Maria Sena, Breena Tafoya, Lawrence Tafoya, George Trujillo, Diane Trujillo, Eloy Roybal, Anita Roybal, Pauline Espinoza, Randy Espinoza, Dolores Espinoza, Pedro Romero and Valerie Romero
Defendant: United States Forest Service
Case Number: 1:2022cv00434
Filed: June 8, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: James O Browning
Referring Judge: Laura Fashing
2 Judge: Carmen E Garza
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 552 Freedom of Information Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2022 Filing 14 FINAL JUDGMENT by District Judge James O. Browning. (bap)
October 6, 2022 Filing 13 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Patrick Griego (Dow, Mark)
August 4, 2022 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Case Transferred In - Divisional Transfer, Complaint by United States Forest Service. Related document: #1 Case Transferred In - Divisional Transfer, Complaint filed by Patrick Griego. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Lucero, Manuel)
August 3, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: Nos. 4 and 8. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (kg)
July 29, 2022 Filing 10 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to United States District Judge James O. Browning as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. United States Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (ng)
July 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing granting #7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. Defendant's answer due 8/12/2022. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (cda)
July 13, 2022 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Case Transferred In - Divisional Transfer, Complaint by United States Forest Service. (Lucero, Manuel)
July 13, 2022 Filing 6 *DUPLICATE ENTRY* NOTICE of Appearance by Manuel Lucero on behalf of All Defendants (Lucero, Manuel) Modified text on 7/14/2022 (cer).
July 13, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Manuel Lucero on behalf of United States Forest Service (Lucero, Manuel)
June 9, 2022 Summons Issued as to United States Forest Service, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (jg)
June 9, 2022 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-8310727 re #1 Case Transferred In - Divisional Transfer, Complaint filed by Patrick Griego (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Weisman, Cynthia)
June 8, 2022 Filing 3 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
June 8, 2022 Filing 2 APPENDIX/SUPPLEMENT Civil Cover Sheet by Patrick Griego (Weisman, Cynthia)
June 8, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Patrick Griego. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Weisman, Cynthia) Modified on 6/8/2022 (jg).
June 8, 2022 United States Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza and United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing assigned. (jg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Griego et al v. United States Forest Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Griego
Represented By: Antonia Roybal-Mack
Represented By: Christopher P. Bauman
Represented By: Mark Dow
Represented By: Mary Louise Boelcke
Represented By: Cynthia L. Weisman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leo Pacheco
Represented By: Antonia Roybal-Mack
Represented By: Christopher P. Bauman
Represented By: Cynthia L. Weisman
Represented By: Mark Dow
Represented By: Mary Louise Boelcke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annabelle Pacheco
Represented By: Antonia Roybal-Mack
Represented By: Christopher P. Bauman
Represented By: Cynthia L. Weisman
Represented By: Mark Dow
Represented By: Mary Louise Boelcke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adelaido Trujillo
Represented By: Antonia Roybal-Mack
Represented By: Christopher P. Bauman
Represented By: Cynthia L. Weisman
Represented By: Mark Dow
Represented By: Mary Louise Boelcke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Generose Trujillo
Represented By: Mary Louise Boelcke
Represented By: Antonia Roybal-Mack
Represented By: Christopher P. Bauman
Represented By: Cynthia L. Weisman
Represented By: Mark Dow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Ortiz
Represented By: Antonia Roybal-Mack
Represented By: Christopher P. Bauman
Represented By: Cynthia L. Weisman
Represented By: Mark Dow
Represented By: Mary Louise Boelcke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Ortiz
Represented By: Antonia Roybal-Mack
Represented By: Christopher P. Bauman
Represented By: Cynthia L. Weisman
Represented By: Mark Dow
Represented By: Mary Louise Boelcke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samantha Ortiz
Represented By: Antonia Roybal-Mack
Represented By: Christopher P. Bauman
Represented By: Cynthia L. Weisman
Represented By: Mark Dow
Represented By: Mary Louise Boelcke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anita Ortiz
Represented By: Mary Louise Boelcke
Represented By: Antonia Roybal-Mack
Represented By: Christopher P. Bauman
Represented By: Cynthia L. Weisman
Represented By: Mark Dow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Franken
Represented By: Antonia Roybal-Mack
Represented By: Christopher P. Bauman
Represented By: Cynthia L. Weisman
Represented By: Mark Dow
Represented By: Mary Louise Boelcke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Abreu
Represented By: Antonia Roybal-Mack
Represented By: Christopher P. Bauman
Represented By: Cynthia L. Weisman
Represented By: Mark Dow
Represented By: Mary Louise Boelcke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jim Abreu
Represented By: Christopher P. Bauman
Represented By: Cynthia L. Weisman
Represented By: Antonia Roybal-Mack
Represented By: Mark Dow
Represented By: Mary Louise Boelcke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Miglin
Represented By: Antonia Roybal-Mack
Represented By: Christopher P. Bauman
Represented By: Cynthia L. Weisman
Represented By: Mark Dow
Represented By: Mary Louise Boelcke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Bowden
Represented By: Antonia Roybal-Mack
Represented By: Christopher P. Bauman
Represented By: Cynthia L. Weisman
Represented By: Mark Dow
Represented By: Mary Louise Boelcke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Childers
Represented By: Antonia Roybal-Mack
Represented By: Christopher P. Bauman
Represented By: Cynthia L. Weisman
Represented By: Mark Dow
Represented By: Mary Louise Boelcke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Childers Burns
Represented By: Antonia Roybal-Mack
Represented By: Christopher P. Bauman
Represented By: Cynthia L. Weisman
Represented By: Mark Dow
Represented By: Mary Louise Boelcke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clark Burns
Represented By: Antonia Roybal-Mack
Represented By: Christopher P. Bauman
Represented By: Cynthia L. Weisman
Represented By: Mark Dow
Represented By: Mary Louise Boelcke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edna Burns
Represented By: Antonia Roybal-Mack
Represented By: Christopher P. Bauman
Represented By: Cynthia L. Weisman
Represented By: Mark Dow
Represented By: Mary Louise Boelcke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Loretta Chavez
Represented By: Antonia Roybal-Mack
Represented By: Christopher P. Bauman
Represented By: Cynthia L. Weisman
Represented By: Mark Dow
Represented By: Mary Louise Boelcke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Chavez
Represented By: Antonia Roybal-Mack
Represented By: Christopher P. Bauman
Represented By: Cynthia L. Weisman
Represented By: Mark Dow
Represented By: Mary Louise Boelcke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Encinias
Represented By: Antonia Roybal-Mack
Represented By: Christopher P. Bauman
Represented By: Cynthia L. Weisman
Represented By: Mark Dow
Represented By: Mary Louise Boelcke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori Anne Encinias
Represented By: Antonia Roybal-Mack
Represented By: Christopher P. Bauman
Represented By: Cynthia L. Weisman
Represented By: Mark Dow
Represented By: Mary Louise Boelcke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Esquibel
Represented By: Antonia Roybal-Mack
Represented By: Christopher P. Bauman
Represented By: Cynthia L. Weisman
Represented By: Mark Dow
Represented By: Mary Louise Boelcke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Esquibel
Represented By: Antonia Roybal-Mack
Represented By: Christopher P. Bauman
Represented By: Cynthia L. Weisman
Represented By: Mark Dow
Represented By: Mary Louise Boelcke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Hollis
Represented By: Antonia Roybal-Mack
Represented By: Christopher P. Bauman
Represented By: Cynthia L. Weisman
Represented By: Mark Dow
Represented By: Mary Louise Boelcke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter Hughes
Represented By: Antonia Roybal-Mack
Represented By: Christopher P. Bauman
Represented By: Cynthia L. Weisman
Represented By: Mark Dow
Represented By: Mary Louise Boelcke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharron Hughes
Represented By: Antonia Roybal-Mack
Represented By: Christopher P. Bauman
Represented By: Cynthia L. Weisman
Represented By: Mark Dow
Represented By: Mary Louise Boelcke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander Kwan
Represented By: Antonia Roybal-Mack
Represented By: Christopher P. Bauman
Represented By: Cynthia L. Weisman
Represented By: Mark Dow
Represented By: Mary Louise Boelcke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fiachna Rose
Represented By: Antonia Roybal-Mack
Represented By: Christopher P. Bauman
Represented By: Cynthia L. Weisman
Represented By: Mark Dow
Represented By: Mary Louise Boelcke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erica Larsen
Represented By: Antonia Roybal-Mack
Represented By: Christopher P. Bauman
Represented By: Cynthia L. Weisman
Represented By: Mark Dow
Represented By: Mary Louise Boelcke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyler White
Represented By: Antonia Roybal-Mack
Represented By: Christopher P. Bauman
Represented By: Cynthia L. Weisman
Represented By: Mark Dow
Represented By: Mary Louise Boelcke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herman Lujan
Represented By: Antonia Roybal-Mack
Represented By: Christopher P. Bauman
Represented By: Cynthia L. Weisman
Represented By: Mark Dow
Represented By: Mary Louise Boelcke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorraine Lujan
Represented By: Antonia Roybal-Mack
Represented By: Christopher P. Bauman
Represented By: Cynthia L. Weisman
Represented By: Mark Dow
Represented By: Mary Louise Boelcke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theodore Lujan
Represented By: Antonia Roybal-Mack
Represented By: Christopher P. Bauman
Represented By: Cynthia L. Weisman
Represented By: Mark Dow
Represented By: Mary Louise Boelcke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorenzo Lujan
Represented By: Antonia Roybal-Mack
Represented By: Christopher P. Bauman
Represented By: Cynthia L. Weisman
Represented By: Mark Dow
Represented By: Mary Louise Boelcke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Rivera
Represented By: Antonia Roybal-Mack
Represented By: Christopher P. Bauman
Represented By: Cynthia L. Weisman
Represented By: Mark Dow
Represented By: Mary Louise Boelcke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felicia Rivera
Represented By: Antonia Roybal-Mack
Represented By: Christopher P. Bauman
Represented By: Cynthia L. Weisman
Represented By: Mark Dow
Represented By: Mary Louise Boelcke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Sandoval
Represented By: Antonia Roybal-Mack
Represented By: Christopher P. Bauman
Represented By: Cynthia L. Weisman
Represented By: Mark Dow
Represented By: Mary Louise Boelcke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donata Sena
Represented By: Antonia Roybal-Mack
Represented By: Christopher P. Bauman
Represented By: Cynthia L. Weisman
Represented By: Mark Dow
Represented By: Mary Louise Boelcke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Sena
Represented By: Antonia Roybal-Mack
Represented By: Christopher P. Bauman
Represented By: Cynthia L. Weisman
Represented By: Mark Dow
Represented By: Mary Louise Boelcke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Breena Tafoya
Represented By: Antonia Roybal-Mack
Represented By: Christopher P. Bauman
Represented By: Cynthia L. Weisman
Represented By: Mark Dow
Represented By: Mary Louise Boelcke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence Tafoya
Represented By: Antonia Roybal-Mack
Represented By: Christopher P. Bauman
Represented By: Cynthia L. Weisman
Represented By: Mark Dow
Represented By: Mary Louise Boelcke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Trujillo
Represented By: Antonia Roybal-Mack
Represented By: Christopher P. Bauman
Represented By: Cynthia L. Weisman
Represented By: Mark Dow
Represented By: Mary Louise Boelcke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Trujillo
Represented By: Antonia Roybal-Mack
Represented By: Christopher P. Bauman
Represented By: Cynthia L. Weisman
Represented By: Mark Dow
Represented By: Mary Louise Boelcke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eloy Roybal
Represented By: Antonia Roybal-Mack
Represented By: Christopher P. Bauman
Represented By: Cynthia L. Weisman
Represented By: Mark Dow
Represented By: Mary Louise Boelcke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anita Roybal
Represented By: Antonia Roybal-Mack
Represented By: Christopher P. Bauman
Represented By: Cynthia L. Weisman
Represented By: Mark Dow
Represented By: Mary Louise Boelcke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pauline Espinoza
Represented By: Antonia Roybal-Mack
Represented By: Christopher P. Bauman
Represented By: Cynthia L. Weisman
Represented By: Mark Dow
Represented By: Mary Louise Boelcke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy Espinoza
Represented By: Antonia Roybal-Mack
Represented By: Christopher P. Bauman
Represented By: Cynthia L. Weisman
Represented By: Mark Dow
Represented By: Mary Louise Boelcke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dolores Espinoza
Represented By: Antonia Roybal-Mack
Represented By: Christopher P. Bauman
Represented By: Cynthia L. Weisman
Represented By: Mark Dow
Represented By: Mary Louise Boelcke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pedro Romero
Represented By: Antonia Roybal-Mack
Represented By: Christopher P. Bauman
Represented By: Cynthia L. Weisman
Represented By: Mark Dow
Represented By: Mary Louise Boelcke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valerie Romero
Represented By: Antonia Roybal-Mack
Represented By: Christopher P. Bauman
Represented By: Cynthia L. Weisman
Represented By: Mark Dow
Represented By: Mary Louise Boelcke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Forest Service
Represented By: Manuel Lucero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?