Harrington III v. Luxury Home Broker ABQ, LLC et al
Defendant: Luxury Home Broker ABQ, LLC and Wende Calvert
Counter Defendant: Blaine Harrington III
Case Number: 1:2022cv00689
Filed: September 19, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Kenneth J Gonzales
Referring Judge: Kevin R Sweazea
2 Judge: Gregory B Wormuth
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2022 Filing 11 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
October 28, 2022 Filing 10 Plaintiff's ANSWER to #7 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, by Blaine Harrington III.(DeSouza, Daniel)
October 24, 2022 Filing 9 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth. Joint Status Report due by 12/1/2022. Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 12/15/2022 at 04:00 PM before Chief Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth. Parties shall call Judge Wormuth's teleconference line at (877) 402-9753, access code 7578461 to be connected to the proceedings. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 11/14/2022. (es)
October 24, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE by Wende Calvert, Luxury Home Broker ABQ, LLC Entry of Appearance (Squires, Jeffrey)
October 21, 2022 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Blaine Harrington III by Wende Calvert, Luxury Home Broker ABQ, LLC. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by Blaine Harrington III. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Squires, Jeffrey)
October 21, 2022 Filing 6 ***FILED IN ERROR*** ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Blaine Harrington III by Wende Calvert, Luxury Home Broker ABQ, LLC. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by Blaine Harrington III.(Squires, Jeffrey) Modified text on 10/21/2022 per attorney request. To be refiled (gr).
October 21, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Blaine Harrington III. Wende Calvert served on 10/8/2022, answer due 10/31/2022. (DeSouza, Daniel)
October 21, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Blaine Harrington III. Luxury Home Broker ABQ, LLC served on 10/8/2022, answer due 10/31/2022. (DeSouza, Daniel)
September 19, 2022 Filing 3 Report re: copyright (jg)
September 19, 2022 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
September 19, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Wende Calvert, Luxury Home Broker ABQ, LLC ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by BLAINE HARRINGTON III. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(DeSouza, Daniel)
September 19, 2022 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-8467369 re #1 Complaint, filed by BLAINE HARRINGTON III (Payment made via Pay.gov)(DeSouza, Daniel)
September 19, 2022 Summons Issued as to Wende Calvert, Luxury Home Broker ABQ, LLC. (jg)
September 19, 2022 United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea and Chief United States Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth assigned. (jg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harrington III v. Luxury Home Broker ABQ, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Blaine Harrington III
Represented By: Daniel DeSouza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luxury Home Broker ABQ, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey L Squires
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wende Calvert
Represented By: Jeffrey L Squires
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?