Molina v. Jay Holding Group LLC et al
Plaintiff: Carlos Manuel Molina
Defendant: Jay Holding Group LLC doing business as Presidential Inn & Suites, S P Install Floorings LLC and Samuel Perez
Case Number: 1:2022cv00702
Filed: September 23, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Laura Fashing
Referring Judge: John F Robbenhaar
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 704 Labor Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference set for 1/9/2023 at 02:00 PM in Albuquerque - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan due by 1/2/2023. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 12/8/2022. (cda) Modified on 11/18/2022 (dr).
November 16, 2022 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Jay Holding Group LLC. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Carlos Manuel Molina.(Thomas, Krystle)
November 14, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Krystle A Thomas on behalf of Jay Holding Group LLC (Thomas, Krystle)
October 24, 2022 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carlos Manuel Molina. (Dore, James)
October 24, 2022 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carlos Manuel Molina. (Dore, James)
October 24, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carlos Manuel Molina. (Dore, James)
October 21, 2022 Filing 7 **FILED IN ERROR** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carlos Manuel Molina. S P Install Floorings LLC served on 9/29/2022, answer due 10/20/2022. (Dore, James) Modified on 10/24/2022 (dr).
October 21, 2022 Filing 6 **FILED IN ERROR**SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carlos Manuel Molina. Jay Holding Group LLC served on 9/29/2022, answer due 10/20/2022. (Dore, James) Modified on 10/24/2022 (dr).
October 21, 2022 Filing 5 **FILED IN ERROR**SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carlos Manuel Molina. Samuel Perez served on 9/29/2022, answer due 10/20/2022. (Dore, James) Modified on 10/24/2022 (dr).
October 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing TO OBTAIN ATTORNEY AND STRIKING #3 Answer to Complaint filed by Jay Holding Group LLC. (cda)
October 17, 2022 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Jay Holding Group LLC. (dr)
September 26, 2022 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-8477481 re #1 Complaint filed by Carlos Manuel Molina (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Dore, James)
September 23, 2022 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
September 23, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Carlos Manuel Molina. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Supplement)(Dore, James)
September 23, 2022 United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar and United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing assigned. (jg)
September 23, 2022 Summons Issued as to Jay Holding Group LLC, Samuel Perez, S P Install Floorings LLC. (jg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Molina v. Jay Holding Group LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Manuel Molina
Represented By: James Dore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay Holding Group LLC doing business as Presidential Inn & Suites
Represented By: Charles J. Vigil
Represented By: Krystle A Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S P Install Floorings LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?