McDaniel v. Sovereign et al
Plaintiff: Cineca McDaniel
Defendant: Amanda Sovereign and Knight Transportation, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2022cv00715
Filed: September 28, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Gregory B Wormuth
Referring Judge: Steven C Yarbrough
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE OF CONSENT SUBMISSION DEADLINE: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(2), the parties are reminded that a magistrate judge was assigned as the trial judge in this matter under 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties are advised that the Clerk will reassign this matter to a district judge as the trial judge no later than November 28, 2022 unless consents from all parties have been filed. The parties are free to withhold consent. If you have already entered your consent, you need not resubmit. (kls)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
November 18, 2022 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Knight Transportation, Inc., Amanda Sovereign Initial Disclosures (Sedillo, Raul)
November 17, 2022 Filing 7 Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan by Knight Transportation, Inc., Amanda Sovereign (Sedillo, Raul)
November 10, 2022 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Knight Transportation, Inc. (Sedillo, Raul)
November 1, 2022 Filing 5 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Knight Transportation, Inc., Amanda Sovereign voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Chief Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Sedillo, Raul)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 11/29/2022 at 10:30 AM. Joint Status Report due by 11/18/2022. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 11/01/2022. (cm)
October 6, 2022 Filing 3 Defendants ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Knight Transportation, Inc., Amanda Sovereign. (Sedillo, Raul)
September 28, 2022 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Chief Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
September 28, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Knight Transportation, Inc., Amanda Sovereign from 8th Judicial District of NM, case number D-809-CV-2022-00092. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Knight Transportation, Inc., Amanda Sovereign. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Sedillo, Raul)
September 28, 2022 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-8483147 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Knight Transportation, Inc., Amanda Sovereign (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Sedillo, Raul)
September 28, 2022 Chief United States Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth and United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough assigned. (jg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McDaniel v. Sovereign et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cineca McDaniel
Represented By: Grace Elizabeth Jennings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amanda Sovereign
Represented By: Christie Geter
Represented By: Raul P Sedillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Knight Transportation, Inc.
Represented By: Christie Geter
Represented By: Raul P Sedillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?