Dine Citizens Against Ruining our Environment et al v. United States Bureau of Land Management et al
Plaintiff: Dine Citizens Against Ruining our Environment, San Juan Citizens Alliance, WildEarth Guardians and Sierra Club
Defendant: United States Bureau of Land Management, Secretary of the Int Debra Haaland, Acting NM Director Melanie Barnes, Dep St Dir Minerals Sheila Mallory, Debra Haaland, Melanie Barnes and Sheila Mallory
Intervenor: EOG Resources, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2022cv00804
Filed: October 26, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: William P Johnson
Referring Judge: Kirtan Khalsa
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 4321 Review of Agency Action-Environment
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2022 Filing 22 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: No. 20. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (kg)
December 20, 2022 Filing 21 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to Chief United States District Judge William P. Johnson as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
December 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATED ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa GRANTING #18 Joint Motion to Extend Deadline for Joint Status Report. The deadline for Federal Defendants to respond to Plaintiffs' Petition for Review of Agency Action is VACATED. The parties' Joint Status Report is due no later than March 3, 2023 as provided in this Order. (nlb)
December 14, 2022 Filing 18 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report by Melanie Barnes, Debra Haaland, Sheila Mallory, United States Bureau of Land Management. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Declaration of Adam Lujan) (Boronow, Clare)
December 9, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew A Smith on behalf of Melanie Barnes, Debra Haaland, Sheila Mallory, United States Bureau of Land Management (Smith, Andrew)
December 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 AMENDED INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. The parties must meet and confer by 12/14/2022 and file a joint status report by 12/27/2022. The deadline to consent to the assigned presiding United States Magistrate Judge is 12/28/2022. The scheduling conference set for 01/04/2023 is VACATED. (nlb)
December 7, 2022 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by EOG Resources, Inc. (Sutphin, Robert)
December 7, 2022 Filing 14 MOTION to Intervene by EOG Resources, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Sutphin, Robert)
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. Counsel are to meet and confer by 12/14/2022. The parties' Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan is due by 12/27/2022. A Telephonic Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference is set for 01/04/2023 at 10:30 a.m. MT before Judge Khalsa. Counsel are to call Judge Khalsa's AT&T conference line at (877) 848-7030 and enter the code 7324132 to connect to the proceedings. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 12/28/2022. (nlb)
November 14, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Clare Marie Boronow on behalf of All Defendants (Boronow, Clare)
November 3, 2022 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sierra Club, Dine Citizens Against Ruining our Environment, WildEarth Guardians, San Juan Citizens Alliance. US Attorney General served on 10/28/2022, answer due 12/27/2022. (jg)
November 3, 2022 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sierra Club, Dine Citizens Against Ruining our Environment, WildEarth Guardians, San Juan Citizens Alliance. U.S. Attorney served on 10/28/2022, answer due 12/27/2022. (jg) Modified on 11/3/2022 (jg). (Main Document 10 replaced on 11/3/2022) (jg).
November 3, 2022 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sierra Club, Dine Citizens Against Ruining our Environment, WildEarth Guardians, San Juan Citizens Alliance. Sheila Mallory served on 10/28/2022, answer due 12/27/2022. (Beasley, Allyson) Modified on 11/3/2022 (jg).
November 3, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sierra Club, Dine Citizens Against Ruining our Environment, WildEarth Guardians, San Juan Citizens Alliance. Melanie Barnes served on 10/28/2022, answer due 12/27/2022. (Beasley, Allyson) Modified on 11/3/2022 (jg).
November 3, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sierra Club, Dine Citizens Against Ruining our Environment, WildEarth Guardians, San Juan Citizens Alliance. Debra Haaland served on 10/28/2022, answer due 12/27/2022. (Beasley, Allyson) Modified on 11/3/2022 (jg).
November 3, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sierra Club, Dine Citizens Against Ruining our Environment, WildEarth Guardians, San Juan Citizens Alliance. United States Bureau of Land Management served on 10/28/2022, answer due 12/27/2022. (Beasley, Allyson) Modified on 11/3/2022 (jg).
November 2, 2022 Filing 5 ***FILED IN ERROR*** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sierra Club, Dine Citizens Against Ruining our Environment, WildEarth Guardians, San Juan Citizens Alliance. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service - Deb Haaland, #2 Proof of Service - M. Barnes, #3 Proof of Service - S. Mallory, #4 Proof of Service - US Attorney, #5 Proof of Service - US BLM)(Beasley, Allyson) Modified on 11/3/2022 (jg).
October 27, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE by Dine Citizens Against Ruining our Environment, San Juan Citizens Alliance, Sierra Club, WildEarth Guardians re #1 Complaint, of Related Case (Beasley, Allyson)
October 27, 2022 Filing 3 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
October 27, 2022 United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter and United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa assigned. (jg)
October 27, 2022 Summons Issued as to Melanie Barnes, Debra Haaland, Sheila Mallory, United States Bureau of Land Management, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (jg)
October 26, 2022 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Dine Citizens Against Ruining our Environment, San Juan Citizens Alliance, Sierra Club, WildEarth Guardians (Beasley, Allyson)
October 26, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Sierra Club, Dine Citizens Against Ruining our Environment, WildEarth Guardians, San Juan Citizens Alliance. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Challenged Leasing Decisions, #2 Appendix Challenged APDs, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Beasley, Allyson)
October 26, 2022 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-8526617 re #1 Complaint, filed by San Juan Citizens Alliance, WildEarth Guardians, Sierra Club, Dine Citizens Against Ruining our Environment (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Beasley, Allyson)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dine Citizens Against Ruining our Environment et al v. United States Bureau of Land Management et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dine Citizens Against Ruining our Environment
Represented By: Allyson Beasley
Represented By: Rose Rushing
Represented By: Kyle Tisdel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: San Juan Citizens Alliance
Represented By: Allyson Beasley
Represented By: Kyle Tisdel
Represented By: Rose Rushing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WildEarth Guardians
Represented By: Allyson Beasley
Represented By: Kyle Tisdel
Represented By: Rose Rushing
Represented By: Samantha M Ruscavage-Barz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sierra Club
Represented By: Allyson Beasley
Represented By: David Richard Baake
Represented By: Kyle Tisdel
Represented By: Rose Rushing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Bureau of Land Management
Represented By: Andrew A Smith
Represented By: Clare Marie Boronow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary of the Int Debra Haaland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting NM Director Melanie Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dep St Dir Minerals Sheila Mallory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debra Haaland
Represented By: Clare Marie Boronow
Represented By: Andrew A Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melanie Barnes
Represented By: Clare Marie Boronow
Represented By: Andrew A Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheila Mallory
Represented By: Andrew A Smith
Represented By: Clare Marie Boronow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: EOG Resources, Inc.
Represented By: Ann D Navaro
Represented By: John Frederick Shepherd
Represented By: Robert J Sutphin
Represented By: Hadassah M. Reimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?