Serna v. BBVA USA
Plaintiff: Mike Serna
Defendant: BBVA USA, BBVA Compass Bank and PNC Bank
Case Number: 1:2022cv00852
Filed: November 8, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Jerry H Ritter
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2023 Filing 12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION by BBVA USA. (Sauer, Noell)
January 4, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Noell E Sauer on behalf of All Defendants (Sauer, Noell)
December 9, 2022 Filing 10 RESPONSE re #8 Order to Show Cause, Set Deadlines filed by Mike Serna. (snw)
December 9, 2022 Filing 9 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against BBVA USA., filed by Mike Serna(snw)
December 9, 2022 Summons Issued as to BBVA USA. (snw)
November 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter. Show Cause Response due by 12/12/2022. Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint due by 12/12/2022. (sjl)
November 22, 2022 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against BBVA USA., filed by Mike Serna. (bp)
November 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER STRIKING DOCUMENTS AND ORDER FOR AMENDED COMPLAINT by Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter. Documents #1 , #2 , #3 are hereby STRICKEN. Plaintiff Mike Serna may, within 21 days of entry of this Order, file an amended complaint. Failure to timely file an amended complaint may result in dismissal of this case. (hm)
November 9, 2022 Filing 5 Filing Fee: $ 402, receipt number 1000864 (snw)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
November 9, 2022 Filing 4 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter has been assigned for a 28 U.S.C. 1915 review. (dr)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
November 9, 2022 United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter assigned. (dr)
November 8, 2022 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT by Mike Serna (dr)
November 8, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to File by Mike Serna. (dr)
November 8, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BBVA USA, filed by Mike Serna. (dr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Serna v. BBVA USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BBVA USA
Represented By: Abigail M. Yates
Represented By: Noell E Sauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BBVA Compass Bank
Represented By: Noell E Sauer
Represented By: Abigail M. Yates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PNC Bank
Represented By: Noell E Sauer
Represented By: Abigail M. Yates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mike Serna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?