Summit Lake Park Eagle Restoration Systems, LLC v. Lodging Advisory Rio Rancho Blvd. Deluxe, LLC
Plaintiff: Summit Lake Park Eagle Restoration Systems, LLC d/b/a Servpro of Summit, Lake, Park & Eagle Counties and Summit Lake Park Eagle Restoration Systems, LLC doing business as Servpro of Summit, Lake, Park & Eagle Counties
Defendant: Lodging Advisory Rio Rancho Blvd. Deluxe, LLC
Case Number: 1:2022cv00870
Filed: November 15, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Jerry H Ritter
Referring Judge: Gregory B Wormuth
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Chief Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth. Show Cause Response due from Plaintiff no later than fourteen (14) days from the date of this order. (es)
November 28, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Summit Lake Park Eagle Restoration Systems, LLC. Lodging Advisory Rio Rancho Blvd. Deluxe, LLC served on 11/22/2022, answer due 12/13/2022. (Stanford, Meghan)
November 21, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE by Summit Lake Park Eagle Restoration Systems, LLC Notice of Good Standing (Hoskins, Tranter) (Stanford, Meghan)
November 18, 2022 Filing 4 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiff Summit Lake Park Eagle Restoration Systems, LLC by Meghan Dimond Stanford on behalf of: Kathleen Tranter DBL Law 221 East Fourth Street Atrium Two, Suite 2500Cincinnati, OH 45202 513-639-7671 ktranter@dbllaw.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Stanford, Meghan)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
November 18, 2022 Filing 3 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiff Summit Lake Park Eagle Restoration Systems, LLC by Meghan Dimond Stanford on behalf of: Kevin Hoskins DBL Law 221 East Fourth Street Atrium Two, Suite 2500Cincinnati, OH 45202 513-639-7671 khoskins@dbllaw.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Stanford, Meghan)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
November 18, 2022 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-8561301 re: # 3 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Summit Lake Park Eagle Restoration Systems, LLC (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Stanford, Meghan)
November 18, 2022 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-8561309 re: # 4 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Summit Lake Park Eagle Restoration Systems, LLC (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Stanford, Meghan)
November 17, 2022 Summons Issued as to Lodging Advisory Rio Rancho Blvd. Deluxe, LLC. (dr)
November 16, 2022 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
November 16, 2022 United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter and United States Chief Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth assigned. (dr)
November 15, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lodging Advisory Rio Rancho Blvd. Deluxe, LLC ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Summit Lake Park Eagle Restoration Systems, LLC d/b/a Servpro of Summit, Lake, Park & Eagle Counties. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A)(Stanford, Meghan)
November 15, 2022 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-8556864 re #1 Complaint, filed by Summit Lake Park Eagle Restoration Systems, LLC d/b/a Servpro of Summit, Lake, Park & Eagle Counties (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Stanford, Meghan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Summit Lake Park Eagle Restoration Systems, LLC v. Lodging Advisory Rio Rancho Blvd. Deluxe, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Summit Lake Park Eagle Restoration Systems, LLC d/b/a Servpro of Summit, Lake, Park & Eagle Counties
Represented By: Meghan Dimond Stanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Summit Lake Park Eagle Restoration Systems, LLC doing business as Servpro of Summit, Lake, Park & Eagle Counties
Represented By: Meghan Dimond Stanford
Represented By: Kathleen Cassidy Tranter
Represented By: Kevin F Hoskins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lodging Advisory Rio Rancho Blvd. Deluxe, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?