Gurule et al v. Nissan Motor Co., Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: Edwin Gurule and Margie C Piaso
Defendant: Nissan Motor Co., Ltd., Nissan North America, Inc. and AnnaMarie Piaso
Not Classified By Court: N. Canales-Yazzie and J. Canales-Yazzie
Case Number: 1:2022cv00872
Filed: November 16, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Judith C Herrera
Referring Judge: Steven C Yarbrough
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE by Edwin Gurule (Ragan, James)
January 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 RESPONSE to Motion re #14 MOTION to Remand filed by Nissan Motor Co., Ltd., Nissan North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Garcia, Tomas)
December 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough granting #17 Joint Motion to Vacate Scheduling Conference and Stay remaining Deadlines in the Initial Scheduling Order pending resolution of the motion to remand. (kfo)
December 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Joint MOTION to Vacate Scheduling Conference and Stay remaining Deadlines in the Initial Scheduling Order by Nissan Motor Co., Ltd., Nissan North America, Inc.. (Garcia, Tomas)
December 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Nissan Motor Co., Ltd., Nissan North America, Inc. of #15 to Plaintiffs' via the CM/ECF System (Garcia, Tomas) Modified text on 12/19/2022 corrected abbreviated text (gr).
December 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE by Nissan Motor Co., Ltd., Nissan North America, Inc. Notice of Extension of Deadline for the Nissan Defendants to File a Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand (Garcia, Tomas) Modified text on 12/19/2022 corrected abbreviated text (gr).
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION to Remand by Edwin Gurule. (Ragan, James)
November 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nissan Motor Co., Ltd. (Garcia, Tomas)
November 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) (1st Amended Complaint) by Nissan Motor Co., Ltd.. (Garcia, Tomas)
November 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. Joint Status Report due by 1/6/2023. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 1/17/2023 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. (kfo)
November 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nissan North America, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Nissan Motor Co., Ltd., Other Affiliate Renault S.A. for Nissan North America, Inc.. (Garcia, Tomas)
November 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Nissan North America, Inc.. (Garcia, Tomas)
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: No. 6. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (kg)
November 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to District Judge Judith C. Herrera as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
November 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ERRATA re #1 Notice of Removal, by Nissan Motor Co., Ltd., Nissan North America, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Errata) (Garcia, Tomas)
November 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
November 17, 2022 Opinion or Order United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing and United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough assigned. (dr)
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Nissan Motor Co., Ltd., Nissan North America, Inc. Service of USDC filed Documents to Plaintiff (Garcia, Tomas)
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Tomas J Garcia on behalf of Nissan Motor Co., Ltd., Nissan North America, Inc. (Garcia, Tomas)
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Nissan Motor Co., Ltd., Nissan North America, Inc. from First Judicial District Court, case number D-117-cv-2022-00289. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Nissan Motor Co., Ltd., Nissan North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Garcia, Tomas)
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-8558370 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Nissan Motor Co., Ltd., Nissan North America, Inc. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Garcia, Tomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gurule et al v. Nissan Motor Co., Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edwin Gurule
Represented By: Gilbert Arrazolo
Represented By: James B Ragan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margie C Piaso
Represented By: Gilbert Arrazolo
Represented By: James B Ragan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nissan Motor Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Tomas J Garcia
Represented By: Amanda Krasulick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nissan North America, Inc.
Represented By: Tomas J Garcia
Represented By: Amanda Krasulick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AnnaMarie Piaso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: N. Canales-Yazzie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: J. Canales-Yazzie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?