Fisher v. Walmart
Plaintiff: Daniel B Fisher
Defendant: Walmart
Case Number: 1:2023cv00028
Filed: January 10, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: James O Browning
Referring Judge: Kevin R Sweazea
2 Judge: Steven C Yarbrough
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 2, 2023 Filing 13 RESPONSE to Plaintiff's Notice re #8 Notice (Other) filed by Walmart. (Unklesbay, Laura)
February 23, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: No. 4. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (kg)
February 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea by District Judge James O. Browning. (arp)
February 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea VACATING the March 22, 2023 Scheduling Conference and all associated deadlines due to the case being reassigned to the Honorable Judge Browning as the presiding judge. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. NO DOCUMENTS ARE ATTACHED.] (atc)
February 21, 2023 Filing 9 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to United States District Judge James O. Browning as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
February 21, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE (Other) re: Consent filed in First Judicial District Court by Daniel B Fisher (jg) Modified on 2/21/2023 (jg).
February 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea. Joint Status Report due by March 15, 2023. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for March 22, 2023 at 11:30 AM. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than February 16, 2023. (atc)
February 2, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE OF CONSENT SUBMISSION DEADLINE: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(2), the parties are reminded that a magistrate judge was assigned as the trial judge in this matter under 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties are advised that the Clerk will reassign this matter to a district judge as the trial judge no later than 14 days from the entry of this notice, or February 16, 2023, unless consents from all parties have been filed. The parties are free to withhold consent. If you have already entered your consent, you need not resubmit. (kfo)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
January 12, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE OF CONSENT SUBMISSION DEADLINE: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(2), the parties are reminded that a magistrate judge was assigned as the trial judge in this matter under 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties are advised that the Clerk will reassign this matter to a district judge as the trial judge no later than 21 days from the entry of this notice unless consents from all parties have been filed. The parties are free to withhold consent. If you have already entered your consent, you need not resubmit. (kfo)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
January 10, 2023 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Walmart. (Unklesbay, Laura)
January 10, 2023 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
January 10, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Walmart from First Judicial District Court, Santa Fe County, NM, case number D-101-CV-2022-02325. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Walmart. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Unklesbay, Laura)
January 10, 2023 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-8627802 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Walmart (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Unklesbay, Laura)
January 10, 2023 United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough and United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea assigned. (jg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fisher v. Walmart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel B Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart
Represented By: Megan Muirhead
Represented By: Laura Meghan Unklesbay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?