Lingua Logica, LLC v. Gessler et al
Plaintiff: Lingua Logica, LLC
Defendant: Damian Gessler, Semantic Options and Semantic Options, LLC
Case Number: 1:2023cv00187
Filed: March 6, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Jennifer M Rozzoni
Referring Judge: Steven C Yarbrough
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 06/13/2023 at 11:30 AM. Joint Status Report due by 06/02/2023. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 05/18/2023. (cm)
April 26, 2023 Filing 13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Semantic Options, LLC. (Grayson, Brian)
April 26, 2023 Filing 12 ANSWER to #5 Amended Complaint, by Semantic Options, LLC.(Grayson, Brian)
April 26, 2023 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Semantic Options, LLC (Grayson, Brian)
April 26, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian G. Grayson on behalf of Semantic Options, LLC (Grayson, Brian)
April 26, 2023 Filing 9 ANSWER to #5 Amended Complaint, by Damian Gessler.(Thomas, Brian)
April 14, 2023 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lingua Logica, LLC. Semantic Options, LLC served on 4/5/2023, answer due 4/26/2023. (Nelson, Amanda)
April 14, 2023 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lingua Logica, LLC. Damian Gessler served on 4/5/2023, answer due 4/26/2023. (Nelson, Amanda)
March 30, 2023 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lingua Logica, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Lingua Logica, LLC for Lingua Logica, LLC. (Adams, Samantha)
March 30, 2023 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Fraud, Civil Conspiracy, Misrepresentation and Breaches of Loyalty, Confidentiality and Fiduciary Duty against Defendants against Semantic Options, LLC, Damian Gessler., filed by Lingua Logica, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3)(Adams, Samantha)
March 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO AMEND COMPLAINT by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. Amendment due by 03/30/2023. (cm)
March 6, 2023 Filing 3 Filing fee received online: $ 402, receipt number BNMDC-8714912 (bap)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
March 6, 2023 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Jennifer M. Rozzoni to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
March 6, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Complaint for Fraud, Civil Conspiracy, Misrepresentation and Breaches of Loyalty, Confidentiality and Fiduciary Duty against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Lingua Logica, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Offer, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Adams, Samantha)
March 6, 2023 United States Magistrate Judge Jennifer M. Rozzoni and United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough assigned. (jg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lingua Logica, LLC v. Gessler et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lingua Logica, LLC
Represented By: Amanda Kaye Nelson
Represented By: Samantha Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Damian Gessler
Represented By: Brian A Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Semantic Options
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Semantic Options, LLC
Represented By: Brian G. Grayson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?