Pacifica Rosemont, LLC v. Kiermont
Plaintiff: Pacifica Rosemont, LLC
Defendant: suzanne kiermont and Elizabeth Garren
Case Number: 1:2023cv00747
Filed: September 5, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Kenneth J Gonzales
Referring Judge: John F Robbenhaar
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 REPLY to Response to Motion re #3 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Pacifica Rosemont, LLC. (Garcia, Tomas)
October 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER FINDING GOOD CAUSE TO DELAY SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. (kc)
October 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to United States District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
October 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Suzanne Kiermont. (O'Grady, John)
October 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by John Vanker O'Grady on behalf of All Defendants (O'Grady, John)
October 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE OF CONSENT SUBMISSION DEADLINE: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(2), the parties are reminded that a magistrate judge was assigned as the trial judge in this matter under 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties are advised that the Clerk will reassign this matter to a district judge as the trial judge no later than 14 days from the entry of this notice unless consents from all parties have been filed. The parties are free to withhold consent. If you have already entered your consent, you need not resubmit. (lj)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
October 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION to Compel Arbitration by Pacifica Rosemont, LLC. (Hernandez, Michelle)
September 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bc)
September 6, 2023 Opinion or Order United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing and United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar assigned. (bc)
September 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT to Compel Arbitration against Suzanne Kiermont ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Pacifica Rosemont, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Hernandez, Michelle) Modified on 9/6/2023 (bc).
September 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-8988725 re #1 Complaint, filed by Pacifica Rosemont, LLC (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Hernandez, Michelle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pacifica Rosemont, LLC v. Kiermont
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pacifica Rosemont, LLC
Represented By: Michelle A Hernandez
Represented By: Tomas J Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: suzanne kiermont
Represented By: John Vanker O'Grady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Garren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?