HTLF Bank v. Peters et al
Plaintiff: HTLF Bank
Defendant: Gerald Peters, III, Kathleen Peters and The Peters Corporation
Case Number: 1:2024cv00035
Filed: January 10, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Kevin R Sweazea
Referring Judge: Gregory B Wormuth
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1330 Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 27, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2024 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants., filed by HTLF Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Mirazo, David)
February 27, 2024 Filing 11 NOTICE by Kathleen Peters, Gerald Peters, III, The Peters Corporation of Non-Availability (Odom, Suzanne)
February 22, 2024 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by HTLF Bank identifying Corporate Parent Heartland Financial USA, Inc. for HTLF Bank. (Mirazo, David)
February 20, 2024 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Peters Corporation (Odom, Suzanne)
February 20, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Suzanne C Odom on behalf of All Defendants (Odom, Suzanne)
February 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea granting #6 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Defendants' responsive pleading due March 5, 2024. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. NO DOCUMENTS ARE ATTACHED.] (atc)
February 16, 2024 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Kathleen Peters, Gerald Peters, III, The Peters Corporation. (Odom, Suzanne)
February 5, 2024 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by HTLF Bank. The Peters Corporation served on 1/30/2024, answer due 2/20/2024. (Mirazo, David)
February 5, 2024 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by HTLF Bank. Kathleen Peters served on 1/30/2024, answer due 2/20/2024. (Mirazo, David)
February 5, 2024 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by HTLF Bank. Gerald Peters, III served on 1/30/2024, answer due 2/20/2024. (Mirazo, David)
January 24, 2024 Summonses Issued as to Kathleen Peters, Gerald Peters, III, and The Peters Corporation. (eh)
January 11, 2024 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Chief Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
January 11, 2024 United States Chief Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth and United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea assigned. (dr)
January 11, 2024 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 405 receipt number ANMDC-9167560 re #1 Complaint filed by HTLF Bank (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Mirazo, David)
January 10, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by HTLF Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mirazo, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HTLF Bank v. Peters et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HTLF Bank
Represented By: David Moises Mirazo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald Peters, III
Represented By: Suzanne C Odom
Represented By: Daniel Bryan Goldberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen Peters
Represented By: Daniel Bryan Goldberg
Represented By: Suzanne C Odom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Peters Corporation
Represented By: Daniel Bryan Goldberg
Represented By: Suzanne C Odom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?