Hilcorp San Juan, L.P. v. Petro Mex, LLC
Plaintiff: Hilcorp San Juan, L.P.
Defendant: Petro Mex, LLC
Case Number: 1:2024cv00067
Filed: January 19, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Laura Fashing
Referring Judge: Kirtan Khalsa
2 Judge: David H Urias
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 Declaratory Judgment
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 20, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2024 Filing 11 Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan by Hilcorp San Juan, L.P. (Sutphin, Robert)
March 12, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: No. 3. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (kg)
March 8, 2024 Filing 9 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly reassigned to United States District Judge David H. Urias as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bc)
February 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference set for 3/20/2024 at 02:30 PM in Albuquerque - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan due by 3/13/2024. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 3/7/2024. (lj)
February 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 "FILED IN ERROR" INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference set for 3/20/2024 at 02:30 PM in Albuquerque - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan due by 3/13/2024. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 3/7/2024. (lj) Modified text on 2/15/2024, corrected order to be entered(eh).
February 14, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Pete V Domenici, Jr on behalf of Petro Mex, LLC (Domenici, Pete)
February 14, 2024 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Petro Mex, LLC. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by Hilcorp San Juan, L.P..(Domenici, Pete)
February 9, 2024 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hilcorp San Juan, L.P. identifying Corporate Parent Hilcorp Energy I, LP, Corporate Parent Hilcorp Energy Company for Hilcorp San Juan, L.P.. (Sutphin, Robert)
January 19, 2024 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bc)
January 19, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Hilcorp San Juan, L.P.'s Complaint for Breach of Contract, Breach of the Duty of Good Faith and Fair Dealing, Unjust Enrichment, and Declaratory Relief against PETRO MEX, LLC ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Hilcorp San Juan, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Sutphin, Robert)
January 19, 2024 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 405 receipt number ANMDC-9179008 re #1 Complaint, filed by Hilcorp San Juan, L.P. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Sutphin, Robert)
January 19, 2024 Summons Issued as to Petro Mex, LLC. (bc)
January 19, 2024 United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa and United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing assigned. (bc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hilcorp San Juan, L.P. v. Petro Mex, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hilcorp San Juan, L.P.
Represented By: Julia Broggi
Represented By: Robert J Sutphin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Petro Mex, LLC
Represented By: Pete V Domenici, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?