New Mexico Horsemen's Association v. Sunray Gaming of New Mexico, LLC
Petitioner: New Mexico Horsemen's Association
Respondent: Sunray Gaming of New Mexico, LLC doing business as Sunray Park & Casino
Intervenor: Downs at Albuquerque, Inc., dba The Downs Racetrack & Casino, All-American Ruidoso Downs, LLC, dba Ruidoso Downs Race Track and Casino and New Mexico Horsemens Association
Cross Defendant: Dr. Paul Jenson, DVM and Sean Alfortish
Case Number: 1:2024cv00235
Filed: March 7, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Matthew L Garcia
Referring Judge: Damian L Martinez
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 2201 Injunction
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 41 RESPONSE in Opposition re #25 MOTION for Preliminary Injunctive Relief filed by Sean Alfortish, Paul Jenson, DVM, New Mexico Horsemen's Association, New Mexico Horsemens Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - 9-5-23 = CV-2023-110 Order TRO, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - 1 - Complaint 4-17-09, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - 10 - Order Denying TRO 4-20-09, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - Facebook Post, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E - Bloodhorse Article) (Mitchell, Gary)
May 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 40 NOTICE by Sean Alfortish, Paul Jenson, DVM, New Mexico Horsemen's Association, New Mexico Horsemens Association of Good Standing of Douglas McSwain (Mitchell, Gary)
May 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Third Party Defendants Sean Alfortish, Paul Jenson, DVM, Petitioner New Mexico Horsemen's Association, Intervenor Defendant New Mexico Horsemens Association by Gary Mitchell on behalf of: Doug McSwain Wyatt, Tarrant & Combs, LLP 250 West Main Street, Suite 1600Lexington, KY 40507 859-361-8346 dmcswain@wyattfirm.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Mitchell, Gary)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
May 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Damian L. Martinez granting #37 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages: Alfortish, Jensen, and the New Mexico Horsemen's Association may file a joint response brief of up to 30 pages as outlined in the motion. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. NO DOCUMENTS ARE ATTACHED.] (dkf)
May 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-9337557 re: # 39 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District,, filed by New Mexico Horsemens Association, Sean Alfortish, New Mexico Horsemen's Association, Paul Jenson, DVM (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Mitchell, Gary)
April 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Sean Alfortish. (Dunn, A.)
April 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 35 NOTICE by Sunray Gaming of New Mexico, LLC Notice of Errata (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Burke, Sonya)
April 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before District Judge Matthew L. Garcia: Status Conference held on 4/26/2024. (Court Reporter P. Baca) (bap)
April 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 34 NOTICE by Sean Alfortish re #29 Opposed MOTION for Recusal of Hon. Matthew Garcia and Reassignment pusuant to 28 USC Sec. 144 of Supplemental Information (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Denise Chambliss) (Dunn, A.)
April 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 33 RESPONSE to Motion re #29 Opposed MOTION for Recusal of Hon. Matthew Garcia and Reassignment pusuant to 28 USC Sec. 144 filed by Sunray Gaming of New Mexico, LLC. (Burke, Sonya)
April 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 32 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by New Mexico Horsemen's Association as to New Mexico Horsemens Association. (Mitchell, Gary)
April 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 31 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by New Mexico Horsemen's Association as to Paul Jenson, DVM. (Mitchell, Gary)
April 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 30 NOTICE of Hearing: In-Person Status Conference set for 4/26/2024 at 02:30 PM in Albuquerque - 520 Gila Courtroom before District Judge Matthew L. Garcia. (emr)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
April 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Opposed MOTION for Recusal of Hon. Matthew Garcia and Reassignment pusuant to 28 USC Sec. 144 by Sean Alfortish. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of A. Blair Dunn, #2 Affidavit Affidavit of Sean Alfortish) (Dunn, A.)
April 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #27 Notice (Other), #25 MOTION for Preliminary Injunctive Relief by Sean Alfortish. (Dunn, A.)
April 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 27 NOTICE by Sunray Gaming of New Mexico, LLC The Racetracks' Request for Expedited Consideration of Motion For Preliminary Injunction (Burke, Sonya)
April 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by A. Blair Dunn on behalf of Sean Alfortish (Dunn, A.)
April 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MOTION for Preliminary Injunctive Relief by All-American Ruidoso Downs, LLC, dba Ruidoso Downs Race Track and Casino, Downs at Albuquerque, Inc., dba The Downs Racetrack & Casino, Sunray Gaming of New Mexico, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K) (Baca, Celina)
April 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 24 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All-American Ruidoso Downs, LLC, dba Ruidoso Downs Race Track and Casino, Sunray Gaming of New Mexico, LLC, Downs at Albuquerque, Inc., dba The Downs Racetrack & Casino. Sean Alfortish served on 4/12/2024, answer due 5/3/2024. (Baca, Celina)
April 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Summons Issued as to Sean Alfortish. (bc)
April 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Intervenor COMPLAINT The Racetrack's Complaint in Intervention and Third-Party Complaint, filed by Downs at Albuquerque, Inc., dba The Downs Racetrack & Casino, All-American Ruidoso Downs, LLC, dba Ruidoso Downs Race Track and Casino. (Walker, Alex)
April 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER by District Judge Matthew L. Garcia granting #11 Motion to Intervene as Plaintiffs in Intervention. Granting #18 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Counterclaims. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (emr)
April 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTICE by New Mexico Horsemen's Association re #11 MOTION to Intervene as Plaintiffs in Intervention Consent (Mitchell, Gary)
April 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER FINDING GOOD CAUSE TO DELAY ENTRY OF A SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Damian L. Martinez. Considering the pending motion to intervene, the Court hereby finds good cause under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16 to delay holding a scheduling conference and entering a scheduling order. The Court will set the case for scheduling once the presiding judge resolves the pending motion. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. NO DOCUMENTS ARE ATTACHED.](dkf)
April 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER by District Judge Matthew L. Garcia. The New Mexico Horsemens Association is hereby ordered to indicate on the docket whether it opposes the Motion to Intervene (Doc. 11) by April 12, 2024, at 5:00 p.m. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (emr)
April 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #11 MOTION to Intervene as Plaintiffs in Intervention by New Mexico Horsemen's Association. (Mitchell, Gary)
March 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge Matthew L. Garcia DENYING #1 Motion for TRO. (cmm)
March 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by New Mexico Horsemen's Association. (Mitchell, Gary)
March 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings, Motion Hearing held on 3/14/2024, before District Judge Matthew L. Garcia. Court Reporter/Transcriber Paul Baca, Telephone number (505)508-6694. Transcript may be viewed at the Clerk's Office public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that each party now has seven (7) calendar days to file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of any personal identifiers from this transcript. If no notice is filed during this seven-day period, the court will assume that redaction of personal data is not necessary and will make the transcript electronically available, as is, to the public after 90 days. For additional guidance, PLEASE REVIEW the complete policy, located in the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures Manual at https://www.nmd.uscourts.gov. Notice of Intent to Request Redaction set for 3/25/2024. Redaction Request due 4/8/2024. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/18/2024. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/17/2024.(pb)
March 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Exhibits admitted during the hearing on March 14, 2024. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (cmm)
March 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE by Sunray Gaming of New Mexico, LLC re #7 Response to Motion, Notice of Supplemental Authority (Baca, Celina)
March 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before District Judge Matthew L. Garcia: Motion Hearing held on 3/14/2024 re #1 Motion for TRO filed by New Mexico Horsemen's Association. (Court Reporter P. Baca) (bap)
March 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION to Intervene as Plaintiffs in Intervention by Sunray Gaming of New Mexico, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1) (Burke, Sonya)
March 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by New Mexico Horsemen's Association. Sunray Gaming of New Mexico, LLC served on 3/13/2024, answer due 4/3/2024. (Mitchell, Gary)
March 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by New Mexico Horsemen's Association. Sunray Gaming of New Mexico, LLC served on 3/12/2024, answer due 4/2/2024. (Mitchell, Gary)
March 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER FINDING GOOD CAUSE TO DELAY ENTRY OF A SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Damian L. Martinez. Considering the pending motion, the Court hereby finds good cause under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16 to delay holding a scheduling conference and entering a scheduling order. The Court will set the case for scheduling once the presiding judge resolves the pending motion. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. NO DOCUMENTS ARE ATTACHED.]
March 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 RESPONSE to Motion re #1 Motion for TRO /Preliminary Injunction filed by Sunray Gaming of New Mexico, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N) (Walker, Alex)
March 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ANSWER to #2 Complaint, for Declaratory Judgment, Emergency Petition for Temporary Restraining Order/Preliminary Injunction and Permanent Injunction by Sunray Gaming of New Mexico, LLC. Related document: #2 Complaint, filed by New Mexico Horsemen's Association.(Walker, Alex)
March 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Hearing: #1 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order/Preliminary Injunction set for 3/14/2024 at 01:00 PM in Albuquerque - 520 Gila Courtroom before District Judge Matthew L. Garcia. (emr)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
March 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 APPENDIX/SUPPLEMENT Information Sheet for TRO by New Mexico Horsemen's Association (Mitchell, Gary)
March 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 APPENDIX/SUPPLEMENT re #1 Motion for TRO, #2 Complaint, Civil cover Sheet by New Mexico Horsemen's Association (Mitchell, Gary)
March 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment, Emergency Petition for Temporary Restraining Odrer/Preliminary Injunction and Permanent Injuction against Sunray Gaming of New Mexico, LLC ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by New Mexico Horsemen's Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Simulcasting Agreement)(Mitchell, Gary)
March 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Petitioner's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order/Preliminary injunction against Sunray Gaming of New Mexico, LLC ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by New Mexico Horsemen's Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Simulcasting Agreement)(Mitchell, Gary) Modified text and docket entry event on 3/7/2024 (bc).
March 7, 2024 Opinion or Order United States District Judge Matthew L. Garcia and United States Magistrate Judge Damian L. Martinez assigned. (bc)
March 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Summons Issued as to Sunray Gaming of New Mexico, LLC. (bc)
March 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 405 receipt number ANMDC-9253988 re #2 Complaint, filed by New Mexico Horsemen's Association, #1 Complaint, filed by New Mexico Horsemen's Association (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Mitchell, Gary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: New Mexico Horsemen's Association v. Sunray Gaming of New Mexico, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: New Mexico Horsemen's Association
Represented By: Gary Mitchell
Represented By: Douglas L. McSwain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Sunray Gaming of New Mexico, LLC doing business as Sunray Park & Casino
Represented By: Alex Cameron Walker
Represented By: Celina Christine Baca
Represented By: Sonya R. Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Downs at Albuquerque, Inc., dba The Downs Racetrack & Casino
Represented By: Alex Cameron Walker
Represented By: Celina Christine Baca
Represented By: Sonya R. Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: All-American Ruidoso Downs, LLC, dba Ruidoso Downs Race Track and Casino
Represented By: Alex Cameron Walker
Represented By: Celina Christine Baca
Represented By: Sonya R. Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: New Mexico Horsemens Association
Represented By: Douglas L. McSwain
Represented By: Gary Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Dr. Paul Jenson, DVM
Represented By: Douglas L. McSwain
Represented By: Gary Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Sean Alfortish
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Jared Robert Vander Dussen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?