UNS Energy Corporation et al v. Shiver Southwest LLC et al
Plaintiff: Tucson Electric Power Company and UNS Energy Corporation
Defendant: Jacob B. Shiver, Shiver Southwest LLC and James B Shiver, Jr.
Case Number: 1:2024cv00556
Filed: June 3, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Laura Fashing
Referring Judge: Kenneth J Gonzales
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2024 Filing 12 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Jacob B. Shiver, James B Shiver, Jr, Shiver Southwest LLC (Bowles, Jason)
July 26, 2024 Filing 11 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Tucson Electric Power Company, UNS Energy Corporation (Waller, Stephen)
July 24, 2024 Filing 10 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Jennifer M. Rozzoni no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (eh)
July 15, 2024 Filing 9 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Jacob B. Shiver, James B Shiver, Jr, Shiver Southwest LLC voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Jennifer M. Rozzoni conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Bowles, Jason)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
July 15, 2024 Filing 8 Defendants' ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Jacob B. Shiver, James B Shiver, Jr, Shiver Southwest LLC. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by UNS Energy Corporation, Tucson Electric Power Company.(Bowles, Jason)
July 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference set for 8/21/2024 at 02:00 PM in Albuquerque - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan due by 8/14/2024. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 7/23/2024. (amf)
June 27, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Bowles on behalf of All Defendants (Bowles, Jason)
June 27, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Bowles on behalf of All Defendants (Bowles, Jason)
June 21, 2024 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons issued 6/4/24 directed to Shiver Southwest, LLC by its registered New Mexico Agent; Endorsed copy of Complaint filed June 3, 2024 (Doc. 001); and printed copy of 6/4/24 Text-Only Notice of Magistrate Judge Assignment (Doc. 002) served on Defendant Shiver Southwest, LLC by its registered agent InCorp Services, Inc. on June 6, 2024, filed by Tucson Electric Power Company, UNS Energy Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Waller, Stephen)
June 12, 2024 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by UNS Energy Corporation, Tucson Electric Power Company. Shiver Southwest LLC served on 6/6/2024, answer due 6/27/2024. (Waller, Stephen)
June 4, 2024 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Jennifer M. Rozzoni to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bc)
June 4, 2024 United States Magistrate Judge Jennifer M. Rozzoni and United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing assigned. (bc)
June 4, 2024 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (bc)
June 3, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Fraudulent Misrepresentation, Negligent Misrepresentation, Successor Liability, Voidable Transactions, Civil Conspiracy, and Unjust Enrichment against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by UNS Energy Corporation, Tucson Electric Power Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement)(Waller, Stephen)
June 3, 2024 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 405 receipt number ANMDC-9387576 re #1 Complaint, filed by UNS Energy Corporation, Tucson Electric Power Company (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Waller, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNS Energy Corporation et al v. Shiver Southwest LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacob B. Shiver
Represented By: Peter J. Eicker
Represented By: Jason Bowles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shiver Southwest LLC
Represented By: Peter J. Eicker
Represented By: Jason Bowles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James B Shiver, Jr.
Represented By: Peter J. Eicker
Represented By: Jason Bowles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tucson Electric Power Company
Represented By: Stephen Bentley Waller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNS Energy Corporation
Represented By: Stephen Bentley Waller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?