Contego Spa Designs Inc. v Goldust Nail Lounge LLC
Plaintiff: Contego Spa Designs Inc.
Defendant: Goldust Nail Lounge LLC
Counter-Claimant: Goldust Nail Lounge LLC
Counter-Defendant: Contego Spa Designs Inc.
Case Number: 1:2024cv00803
Filed: August 12, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: William P Johnson
Referring Judge: John F Robbenhaar
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. § 1126 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2024 Filing 16 Plaintiff's ANSWER to #14 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, by Contego Spa Designs Inc..(Santamaria, Marco)
October 2, 2024 Filing 15 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly reassigned to Chief District Judge William P. Johnson as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bc)
September 24, 2024 Filing 14 Goldust Nail Lounge LLC's ANSWER to Complaint by Contego Spa Design Inc., Amended COUNTERCLAIM by Goldust Nail Lounge, LLC against Contego Spa Designs Inc. by Goldust Nail Lounge LLC. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Contego Spa Designs Inc., #10 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, filed by Goldust Nail Lounge LLC.(Lopez, Kermit)
September 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. Joint Status Report due by 10/14/2024. Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 10/24/2024 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. Counsel will call Judge Robbenhaar's AT&T Teleconference Line at 888-363-4735, Access Code 2387395, to connect to the proceedings. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 10/1/2024. (kc)
September 4, 2024 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Luis M Ortiz on behalf of Goldust Nail Lounge LLC (Ortiz, Luis)
September 4, 2024 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Goldust Nail Lounge LLC (Ortiz, Luis)
September 4, 2024 Filing 10 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint against Goldust Nail Lounge LLC, First COUNTERCLAIM by Defendant against Contego Spa Designs Inc. by Goldust Nail Lounge LLC. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Contego Spa Designs Inc..(Ortiz, Luis)
August 30, 2024 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Contego Spa Designs Inc.. Contego Spa Designs Inc. served on 8/14/2024, answer due 9/4/2024. (Santamaria, Marco) Modified dates on on 9/2/2024 (ac).
August 13, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE by Contego Spa Designs Inc. Pro Hac Vice Certification N. Cohen (Santamaria, Marco)
August 13, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE by Contego Spa Designs Inc. Pro Hac Vice Certification J. Sakaguchi (Santamaria, Marco)
August 13, 2024 Filing 6 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiff Contego Spa Designs Inc. by Marco H. Santamaria on behalf of: Neal M. Cohen Vista IP Law Group LLP 100 Spectrum Center Dr. St 900Irvine, California 92618 949-724-1849 Fax 949-625-8955 nmc@viplawgroup.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Santamaria, Marco)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 13, 2024 Filing 5 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiff Contego Spa Designs Inc. by Marco H. Santamaria on behalf of: James K. Sakaguchi Vista IP Law Group LLP 100 Sectrum Center Dr. St 900Irvine, California 92618 760-803-5967 Fax 949-625-8955 jks@viplawgroup.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Santamaria, Marco)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 13, 2024 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Contego Spa Designs Inc. (Santamaria, Marco)
August 13, 2024 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-9492348 re: # 6 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Contego Spa Designs Inc. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Santamaria, Marco)
August 13, 2024 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-9492340 re: # 5 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Contego Spa Designs Inc. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Santamaria, Marco)
August 13, 2024 Summons Issued as to Goldust Nail Lounge LLC. (bc)
August 12, 2024 Filing 3 Report re: patent (bc)
August 12, 2024 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bc)
August 12, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Goldust Nail Lounge LLC ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Contego Spa Designs. (Santamaria, Marco)
August 12, 2024 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 405 receipt number ANMDC-9491065 re #1 Complaint filed by Contego Spa Designs (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Santamaria, Marco)
August 12, 2024 United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea and United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar assigned. (bc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Contego Spa Designs Inc. v Goldust Nail Lounge LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goldust Nail Lounge LLC
Represented By: Luis M Ortiz
Represented By: Kermit Dean Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Contego Spa Designs Inc.
Represented By: Marco H. Santamaria
Represented By: Neal M. Cohen
Represented By: James Sakaguchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-claimant: Goldust Nail Lounge LLC
Represented By: Luis M Ortiz
Represented By: Kermit Dean Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-defendant: Contego Spa Designs Inc.
Represented By: Neal M. Cohen
Represented By: Marco H. Santamaria
Represented By: James Sakaguchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?