Oakley, Inc. et al v. Rocky Mountain Financial Resource Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Costa Del Mar, Inc. and Oakley, Inc.
Defendant: Alan Keoanui Cofran and Rocky Mountain Financial Resource Corporation doing business as Custom Metal Products, a New Mexico corporation
Case Number: 1:2024cv00872
Filed: August 30, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: James O Browning
Referring Judge: Laura Fashing
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. § 1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2024 Filing 18 NOTICE by Alan Keoanui Cofran, Rocky Mountain Financial Resource Corporation Initial Disclosures (Squires, Jeffrey)
October 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER VACATING INITIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE re #13 Initial Scheduling Order by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. Judge Browning has been assigned to this case and will conduct all pretrial discovery. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference set for 11/7/24 at 2:00 PM in Albuquerque before Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing is VACATED. Judge Browning will set an initial scheduling conference at a later date. (amf) [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
October 21, 2024 Filing 16 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly reassigned to District Judge James O. Browning as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bc)
October 17, 2024 Filing 15 Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan by Oakley, Inc. (Santamaria, Marco)
October 1, 2024 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Alan Keoanui Cofran, Rocky Mountain Financial Resource Corporation. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Costa Del Mar, Inc..(Squires, Jeffrey)
September 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference set for 11/7/2024 at 02:00 PM in Albuquerque - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan due by 10/31/2024. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 10/18/2024. (amf)
September 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer All Defendants. Answer due October 10, 2024. (amf)
September 26, 2024 Filing 11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Alan Keoanui Cofran, Rocky Mountain Financial Resource Corporation. (Squires, Jeffrey)
September 26, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey L Squires on behalf of Alan Keoanui Cofran, Rocky Mountain Financial Resource Corporation (Squires, Jeffrey)
September 9, 2024 Set/Reset Deadlines: Alan Keoanui Cofran answer due 9/26/2024; Rocky Mountain Financial Resource Corporation answer due 9/26/2024. (bc)
September 6, 2024 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Oakley, Inc., Costa Del Mar, Inc.. Rocky Mountain Financial Resource Corporation served on 9/5/2024, answer due 9/26/2024. (Santamaria, Marco) Modified served and answer date on 9/9/2024 (bc).
September 6, 2024 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Oakley, Inc., Costa Del Mar, Inc.. Alan Keoanui Cofran served on 9/5/2024, answer due 9/26/2024. (Santamaria, Marco) Modified served and answer date on 9/9/2024 (bc).
August 30, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE by Costa Del Mar, Inc., Oakley Inc. Pro Hac Vice Certification of Good Standing (Santamaria, Marco)
August 30, 2024 Filing 6 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiffs Costa Del Mar, Inc., Oakley Inc. by Marco H. Santamaria on behalf of: David B. Rosemberg Rosemberg Law 20200 W. Dixie Hwy., Suite 602Aventura, Florida 33180 305.602.2008 Fax 305.602.0225 david@rosemberglaw.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Santamaria, Marco)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 30, 2024 Filing 5 Report re: trademark (dr)
August 30, 2024 Filing 4 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
August 30, 2024 Filing 3 Filing fee: $ 405, receipt number ANMDC-9522092 (dr)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 30, 2024 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Costa Del Mar, Inc., a Florida corporation identifying Corporate Parent Oakley, Inc. for Costa Del Mar, Inc., a Florida corporation. (Santamaria, Marco)
August 30, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Rocky Mountain Financial Resource Corporation d/b/a Custom Metal Products, a New Mexico corporation ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Costa Del Mar, Inc., a Florida corporation. (Santamaria, Marco)
August 30, 2024 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-9523011 re: # 6 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Oakley Inc., Costa Del Mar, Inc. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Santamaria, Marco)
August 30, 2024 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (dr)
August 30, 2024 United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa and United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing assigned. (dr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oakley, Inc. et al v. Rocky Mountain Financial Resource Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan Keoanui Cofran
Represented By: Jeffrey L Squires
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rocky Mountain Financial Resource Corporation doing business as Custom Metal Products, a New Mexico corporation
Represented By: Jeffrey L Squires
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Costa Del Mar, Inc.
Represented By: Marco H. Santamaria
Represented By: David B. Rosemberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oakley, Inc.
Represented By: Marco H. Santamaria
Represented By: David B. Rosemberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?