Brunsen Burner Company et al v. GRP NM LLC et al
Plaintiff: Brunsen Burner Company and Loud Cloud, LLC
Defendant: Fredrick Lawerence, Eugenia Smith, Customer Does 1-10 and GRP NM LLC
Case Number: 1:2024cv00952
Filed: September 25, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Laura Fashing
Referring Judge: John F Robbenhaar
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2024 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brunsen Burner Company. GRP NM LLC served on 10/7/2024, answer due 10/28/2024. (Hunt, Julie)
November 1, 2024 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Order, Summons on GRP NM, LLC served on Cecilia Garcia on 10/07/2024, filed by Brunsen Burner Company. (Hunt, Julie)
October 1, 2024 Filing 5 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Loud Cloud, LLC voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Hunt, Julie)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
October 1, 2024 Filing 4 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Brunsen Burner Company voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Hunt, Julie)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
October 1, 2024 Summons Issued as to GRP NM LLC, Fredrick Lawerence, Eugenia Smith. (bc)
September 26, 2024 Filing 3 Report re: patent. (eh)
September 25, 2024 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (eh)
September 25, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT All Plaintiffs against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by BRUNSEN BURNER COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 GRP Summons, #3 F. Lawerence Summons, #4 E. Smith Summons)(Hunt, Julie)
September 25, 2024 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 405 receipt number ANMDC-9561436 re #1 Complaint, filed by BRUNSEN BURNER COMPANY (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Hunt, Julie)
September 25, 2024 United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar and united States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing assigned. (eh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brunsen Burner Company et al v. GRP NM LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fredrick Lawerence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eugenia Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Customer Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GRP NM LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brunsen Burner Company
Represented By: Julie L Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Loud Cloud, LLC
Represented By: Julie L Hunt,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?