Southwest Concrete Paving Company v. Star Paving Company Division of the Cruz Corporation
Plaintiff: Southwest Concrete Paving Company
Defendant: Star Paving Company Division of the Cruz Corporation
Case Number: 1:2024cv00968
Filed: September 27, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Jennifer M Rozzoni
Referring Judge: Margaret I Strickland
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2024 Filing 12 Letter Remanding Case to Second Judicial District Court, Bernalillo County District Court (jn)
October 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REMANDING CASE by District Judge Margaret I. Strickland. (jsq)
October 15, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE by Star Paving Company Division of the Cruz Corporation re #9 Order of Consent to Remand and Response to Order to Show Cause (Thomas, Benjamin)
October 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by District Judge Margaret I. Strickland. (jsq)
October 11, 2024 Filing 8 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to District Judge Margaret I. Strickland as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Damian L. Martinez no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
October 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Jennifer M. Rozzoni. Rule 16(c) Hearing set for 11/13/2024 at 10:30 AM in Albuquerque - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before Magistrate Judge Jennifer M. Rozzoni. Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan due by 11/6/2024. (kms)
October 4, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE by Southwest Concrete Paving Company re #4 Partial MOTION to Dismiss Count Three of Plaintiff's Complaint for Breach of Contract (Gooch, Christina)
October 1, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(2) and considering the pending dispositive motion, the parties are reminded that a magistrate judge was assigned as the trial judge in this matter under 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties are advised that the Clerk will reassign this matter to a district judge as the trial judge no later than 10 days from the entry of this notice unless consents from all parties have been filed. The parties are free to withhold consent. If you have already entered your consent, you need not resubmit. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. NO DOCUMENTS ARE ATTACHED.] (dkf)
September 30, 2024 Filing 4 Partial MOTION to Dismiss Count Three of Plaintiff's Complaint for Breach of Contract by Star Paving Company Division of the Cruz Corporation. (Thomas, Benjamin)
September 30, 2024 Filing 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Star Paving Company Division of the Cruz Corporation (Thomas, Benjamin)
September 30, 2024 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Damian L. Martinez to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bc)
September 30, 2024 United States Magistrate Judge Damian L. Martinez and United States Magistrate Judge Jennifer M. Rozzoni assigned. (bc)
September 27, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Star Paving Company from 2nd Judicial District, Bernalillo County, NM, case number D-202-CV-2024-06923. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Star Paving Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Ex B, #3 Exhibit C)(Thomas, Benjamin)
September 27, 2024 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 405 receipt number ANMDC-9565928 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Star Paving Company (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Thomas, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Southwest Concrete Paving Company v. Star Paving Company Division of the Cruz Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Southwest Concrete Paving Company
Represented By: Christina Muscarella Gooch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Star Paving Company Division of the Cruz Corporation
Represented By: Benjamin E Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?