State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Defendant: United States of America and United States Postal Service
Case Number: 1:2024cv01092
Filed: October 25, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Kirtan Khalsa
Referring Judge: Gregory B Wormuth
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2674 Federal Tort Claims Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jesse D. Hale on behalf of All Defendants (Hale, Jesse)
December 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa granting #5 ORDER on Motion to Extend time to Respond to Complaint. (eh)
December 20, 2024 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION to Extend (other) Time to Respond to Complaint by United States of America. (Hale, Jesse)
November 19, 2024 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. United States Postal Service served on 11/6/2024, answer due 1/6/2025. (Barnes, Julia)
November 19, 2024 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. United States of America served on 11/6/2024, answer due 1/6/2025. (Barnes, Julia)
October 25, 2024 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Chief Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
October 25, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Subrogation Property Damages against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Barnes, Julia)
October 25, 2024 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 405 receipt number ANMDC-9608680 re #1 Complaint filed by STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Barnes, Julia)
October 25, 2024 United States Chief Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth and United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa assigned. (dr)
October 25, 2024 Summons Issued as to United States Postal Service, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (dr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Jesse D. Hale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Postal Service
Represented By: Jesse D. Hale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Julia Hosford Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?