Canal Insurance Company v. Baca et al
Plaintiff: Canal Insurance Company
Defendant: Tao Express, LLC, Marco Vasquez-Pena and Meaghan Baca
Case Number: 1:2024cv01130
Filed: November 5, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Kirtan Khalsa
Referring Judge: Steven C Yarbrough
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE by Canal Insurance Company re #4 Summons Returned Executed, #1 Complaint Extension of Time for Defendant Baca as PR of the Estate of Steve Cox's Answer to Complaint (Kaselonis, Taryn)
December 11, 2024 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-9678795 re: # 7 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Meaghan Baca (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Caruso, Mark)
December 10, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE by Meaghan Baca Notice of Good Standing (Caruso, Mark)
December 10, 2024 Filing 7 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendant Meaghan Baca by Mark J Caruso on behalf of: Joseph V. Camerlengo the Truck Accident Law Firm 1200 Riverplace Blvd. Suite 902Jacksonville, Florida 32207 904-306-9220 jvc@truckcrashlaw.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Caruso, Mark)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
December 5, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE by Meaghan Baca Entry Of Appearance for Defendant Baca (Caruso, Mark)
December 3, 2024 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Canal Insurance Company. Tao Express, LLC served on 12/1/2024, answer due 12/23/2024. (Kaselonis, Taryn)
December 3, 2024 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Canal Insurance Company. Meaghan Baca served on 11/26/2024, answer due 12/17/2024. (Kaselonis, Taryn)
November 5, 2024 Filing 3 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
November 5, 2024 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Canal Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Canal Financial Group, Inc. for Canal Insurance Company. (Kaselonis, Taryn)
November 5, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Canal Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kaselonis, Taryn)
November 5, 2024 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 405 receipt number ANMDC-9626108 re #1 Complaint filed by Canal Insurance Company (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Kaselonis, Taryn)
November 5, 2024 United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough and United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa assigned. (jg)
November 5, 2024 Summons Issued as to Meaghan Baca, Tao Express, LLC, Marco Vasquez-Pena. (jg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Canal Insurance Company v. Baca et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tao Express, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marco Vasquez-Pena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meaghan Baca
Represented By: Mark J Caruso
Represented By: Joseph V. Camerlengo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Canal Insurance Company
Represented By: Taryn M Kaselonis
Represented By: Pablo Andres Seifert
Represented By: Courtenay L Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?