Kanmodi v. Ericsson Inc
Plaintiff: Kazeem Kanmodi
Defendant: Ericsson Inc
Case Number: 1:2024cv01168
Filed: November 18, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Joel M Carson
Referring Judge: John F Robbenhaar
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2025 Filing 15 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: No. 10. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (kg)
December 19, 2024 Filing 14 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case by Kazeem Kanmodi (White, Alyssa)
December 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answer now due 1/13/2025. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (ck)
December 13, 2024 Filing 12 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #5 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Unopposed Motion by Ericsson Inc. (Neumann, Jon)
December 12, 2024 Filing 11 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to Circuit Judge Joel M. Carson, III as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
December 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REGARDING TELEPHONE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. A telephone scheduling conference is scheduled in this matter for 1/7/2025 at 9:30 a.m. Counsel will call Judge Robbenhaar's Webex Conference Line at 1-855-244-8681, Access Code 2319 590 6841, to connect to the proceedings.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (ck)
December 4, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Alyssa White on behalf of Kazeem Kanmodi (White, Alyssa)
December 4, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew W Dunlap on behalf of Kazeem Kanmodi (Dunlap, Andrew)
December 4, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A Josephson on behalf of Kazeem Kanmodi (Josephson, Michael)
November 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #4 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, to Complaint Ericsson Inc answer due 12/16/2024. (jg)
November 20, 2024 Filing 4 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, to Complaint by Ericsson Inc. (Neumann, Jon)
November 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. Joint Status Report due by 12/30/2024. Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 1/7/2025 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar. Counsel will call Judge Robbenhaar's Webex Conference Line at 1-855-244-8681, Access Code 2305 263 5509, to connect to the proceedings. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 12/10/2024. (ck)
November 18, 2024 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (eh)
November 18, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Ericsson Inc from Santa Fe County First Judicial District Court, case number D-101-cv-2024-02333. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Ericsson Inc. (Attachments: #1 Jon T Neumann Declaration with Exhibits, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Neumann, Jon)
November 18, 2024 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 405 receipt number ANMDC-9644998 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Ericsson Inc (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Neumann, Jon)
November 18, 2024 United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa and United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar assigned. (eh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kanmodi v. Ericsson Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kazeem Kanmodi
Represented By: Richard Burch
Represented By: Philip Matthew Kovnat
Represented By: Michael A Josephson
Represented By: Justin Ross Kaufman
Represented By: Andrew W Dunlap
Represented By: Alyssa White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ericsson Inc
Represented By: Jon Thomas Neumann
Represented By: James N Boudreau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?