Garcia v. State Farm Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Lorenzo Garcia
Defendant: Randy Carney and State Farm Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2024cv01286
Filed: December 20, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Kirtan Khalsa
Referring Judge: Kevin R Sweazea
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1441 Petition for Removal- Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2025 Filing 18 NOTICE of Change of Address by Damon J. Hudson (Hudson, Damon)
February 3, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 17 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea. Joint Status Report due by March 3, 2025. Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for March 12, 2025 at 10:30 AM. Counsel and any pro se party shall call (855) 244-8681 and enter Meeting Code 2300 989 9447# to be connected to the proceedings. (ldm)
January 29, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea VACATING #8 Initial Scheduling Order and associated deadlines and hearings, including the Telephonic Scheduling Conference scheduled for February 4, 2025. A new initial scheduling order will be entered by separate order. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. NO DOCUMENTS ARE ATTACHED.]. (ldm)
January 28, 2025 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lorenzo Garcia Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures (Duran, Michael)
January 28, 2025 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael G Duran on behalf of Lorenzo Garcia (Duran, Michael)
January 28, 2025 Filing 13 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea as the pretrial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bc)
January 24, 2025 Filing 12 Joint Status Report by Randy Carney (Allen, Meena)
January 9, 2025 Filing 11 NOTICE OF RULE 73 CONSENT Received by All Parties. Related documents: 10 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge, filed by Lorenzo Garcia, 9 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge, filed by State Farm Insurance Company, Randy Carney. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
January 8, 2025 Filing 10 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Lorenzo Garcia voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Hudson, Damon)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
December 27, 2024 Filing 9 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), State Farm Insurance Company, Randy Carney voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Allen, Meena)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
December 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. Joint Status Report due by 1/24/2025. Scheduling Conference set for 2/4/2025 at 03:30 PM in Albuquerque - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 1/13/2025. (kfo)
December 23, 2024 Filing 7 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
December 23, 2024 United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa and United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough assigned. (jg)
December 22, 2024 Filing 6 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Randy Carney (Allen, Meena)
December 22, 2024 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by State Farm Insurance Company, Randy Carney. (Allen, Meena)
December 20, 2024 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by State Farm Insurance Company (Allen, Meena)
December 20, 2024 Filing 3 ERRATA re #1 Notice of Removal by Randy Carney (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Allen, Meena)
December 20, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Meena H Allen on behalf of Randy Carney (Allen, Meena)
December 20, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Randy Carney from Second Judicial District Court, case number D-202-CV-2024-08303. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Randy Carney. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Allen, Meena)
December 20, 2024 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 405 receipt number ANMDC-9699773 re #1 Notice of Removal filed by Randy Carney (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Allen, Meena)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garcia v. State Farm Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Carney
Represented By: Meena H Allen
Represented By: Natalie Rose Zerwekh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Insurance Company
Represented By: Natalie Rose Zerwekh
Represented By: Meena H Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorenzo Garcia
Represented By: Michael G Duran
Represented By: Damon J. Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?