Leitch et al v. Castillo et al
Plaintiff: John N Leitch and Diane G Leitch
Defendant: Reggie Castillo and Lorraine Y Castillo
Case Number: 1:2025cv00101
Filed: January 31, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Kirtan Khalsa
Referring Judge: Damian L Martinez
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 12 U.S.C. ยง 1819 Default of Promissory Note
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 20, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2025 Filing 9 Defendants' Amended ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Reggie Castillo, Lorraine Y Castillo. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by John N Leitch, Diane G Leitch.(Feuchter, Benjamin)
March 18, 2025 Reset Hearings: #8 Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference RESET for 5/2/2025 at 10:30 AM in Albuquerque - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. (jg)
March 4, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. Joint Status Report due by 4/21/2025. Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference set for 5/1/2025 at 10:30 AM in Albuquerque - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. Counsel and any pro se parties are to call the Court's WebEx conference line at (855) 244-8681 and enter the code 2308 107 9716 to connect to the proceedings. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 4/24/2025. (jg)
March 3, 2025 Filing 7 Defendants' ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Reggie Castillo, Lorraine Y Castillo. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by John N Leitch, Diane G Leitch.(Feuchter, Benjamin)
February 12, 2025 Filing 6 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), John N Leitch, Diane G Leitch voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Damian L. Martinez conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Thiel, Albert)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
February 12, 2025 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John N Leitch, Diane G Leitch. Reggie Castillo served on 2/10/2025, answer due 3/3/2025. (Thiel, Albert)
February 12, 2025 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John N Leitch. Lorraine Y Castillo served on 2/10/2025, answer due 3/3/2025. (Thiel, Albert)
February 12, 2025 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John N Leitch. All Plaintiffs. (Thiel, Albert)
February 3, 2025 Summons Issued as to Lorraine Y Castillo, Reggie Castillo. (dr)
January 31, 2025 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Damian L. Martinez to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bc)
January 31, 2025 Filing 1 COMPLAINT TO RECOVER A SUM CERTAIN For Defaulted Promissory Note against Lorraine Y Castillo, Reggie Castillo ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by John N Leitch, Diane G Leitch. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh A to complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Plt civil cover sheet)(Thiel, Albert) Modified on 1/31/2025 (bc).
January 31, 2025 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 405 receipt number ANMDC-9757555 re #1 Complaint, filed by John N Leitch, Diane G Leitch (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Thiel, Albert)
January 31, 2025 United States Magistrate Judge Damian L. Martinez and United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa assigned. (bc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leitch et al v. Castillo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John N Leitch
Represented By: Albert N. Thiel, Jr
Represented By: Joseph Thiel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane G Leitch
Represented By: Albert N. Thiel, Jr
Represented By: Joseph Thiel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reggie Castillo
Represented By: Jane R. Elliott
Represented By: Benjamin F Feuchter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lorraine Y Castillo
Represented By: Jane R. Elliott
Represented By: Benjamin F Feuchter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?