Teague v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Anthony David Teague
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2007cv00326
Filed: March 30, 2007
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Office: Las Cruces Office
County: Bernalillo
Presiding Judge: Robert Brack
Presiding Judge: Leslie C. Smith
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255 Motion to Vacate / Correct Illegal Sentence
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Sr. District Judge Robert C. Brack DENYING 36 Response, DENYING 38 MOTION for Order ; DENYING 40 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, AND DENYING 41 MOTION for Reconsideration re 16 Order on Report and Recommendations, 17 Judgment, IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that filing restrictions are imposed; (yc)
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Sr. District Judge Robert C. Brack Dismissing 30 MOTION Judgment and Order, 31 MOTION for Order, 33 MOTION to Amend/Correct, and 34 MOTION to Amend/Correct, Denying as Moot 32 MOTION to Withdraw Motion, Certificate of Appealability is Denied. (jjs)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Sr. District Judge Robert C. Brack Dismissing 24 MOTION for Reconsideration re 22 Memorandum Opinion and Order, 23 Judgment and Denying as Moot 26 MOTION to Expedite Rule 60(b) Motion by Anthony David Teague. Certificate of Appealability is Denied (jjs)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Sr. District Judge Robert C. Brack dismissing for lack of jurisdiction 18 MOTION for Relief From Judgment or Order and denying as moot 20 MOTION to Amend Motion for Relief From Judgment by Anthony David Teague. A Certificate of Appealability is denied and judgment will be entered. (jn)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Teague v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony David Teague
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Lynn Wei-Yu Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?