Sanchez et al v. Surratt et al
Plaintiff: Tanya Sanchez, Vincent Sanchez and Danielle Brizeno
Defendant: Rose Surratt, Danny Surratt, Shirley Seago and Jason Daugherty
Case Number: 2:2013cv00444
Filed: May 10, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Office: Las Cruces Office
County: Lea
Presiding Judge: Carmen E. Garza
Presiding Judge: Martha Vazquez
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 124 FINAL JUDGMENT by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. (kdj)
February 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea granting 109 Motion to Appoint Guardian ad Litem. (cbf)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER OF REFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. (kdj)
January 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 98 AMENDED ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea. Settlement Conference rescheduled for 2/16/2018 at 09:00 AM in Las Cruces - 460 Organ Courtroom (South Tower) before Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea. (cbf)
December 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea. Settlement Conference set for 1/11/2018 at 09:00 AM in Las Cruces - 480 Picacho Courtroom (South Tower). (cbf)
October 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER GRANTING 69 Defendant Danny Surratt's Motion for Summary Judgment by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. (kdj)
September 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt GRANTING 71 Motion for Reconsideration and VACATING 70 Order Granting Motion for Summary Judgment. (kdj)
September 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt granting 69 Motion for Summary Judgment. (kdj)
April 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales VACATING 34 Memorandum Opinion and Order. (tah)
April 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales setting a telephonic status conference for 4/25/2017 at 01:30 PM in Las Cruces - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales. (tah)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanchez et al v. Surratt et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tanya Sanchez
Represented By: Sam Bregman
Represented By: Eric Loman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent Sanchez
Represented By: Sam Bregman
Represented By: Eric Loman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danielle Brizeno
Represented By: Sam Bregman
Represented By: Eric Loman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rose Surratt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danny Surratt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shirley Seago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Daugherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?