Armijo et al v. Hayes et al

Plaintiff: Symore Armijo, Alicia Armijo, Simon Armijo, Della Apachito and Clarice Armijo
Defendant: Rony Hayes, Larry Cearly, Robert Griego and Village of Magdalena
Case Number: 2:2014cv00362
Filed: April 16, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Office: Las Cruces Office
County: Socorro
Presiding Judge: Unassigned
Presiding Judge: Carmen E. Garza
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 125 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge James O. Browning denying Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed on Appeal Without Prepayment of Costs or Fees (non-PLRA) and certifying that Plaintiff's appeal is not taken in good faith. (hj)
December 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 122 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge James O. Browning granting Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to File Notice of Appeal 110 ; the deadline for filing a notice of appeal is November 29, 2017. See Fed. R. App. P. 4(a)(5)(c) (providing no extension may exceed 30 days after the prescribed time). (mnb)
September 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 108 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge James O. Browning adopting the Magistrate Judge's Proposed Findings and Recommended Disposition 102 and granting the Defendant Robert Griego's Motion for Summary Judgment on the Basis of Qualified Immunity 98 . (kw)
January 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 102 Proposed Findings and Recommended Disposition by Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. The Court RECOMMENDS that 98 Defendant Griego's Motion for Summary Judgment on the Basis of Qualified Immunity be GRANTED as outlined in the Proposed Findings a nd Recommended Disposition. Objections to PFRD due by 1/18/2017. Add 3 days to the deadline if service is by mailing it to the person's last known address (or means described in Fed. R. Civ. P. 5(b)(2)(D) and (F)); if service is by electronic means, no additional days are added. (Fed. R. Civ. P. 6(d); Fed. R. Crim. P. 45(c).) (jrt) Modified to correct text per Chambers on 1/4/2017 (bc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Armijo et al v. Hayes et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Symore Armijo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alicia Armijo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Simon Armijo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Della Apachito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clarice Armijo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rony Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Cearly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Griego
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Village of Magdalena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?