Smith et al v. Auto-Owners Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Melvin Smith and Stan Fowler
Defendant: Auto-Owners Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2015cv01153
Filed: December 18, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Office: Las Cruces Office
County: Lea
Presiding Judge: Stephan M. Vidmar
Presiding Judge: Gregory B. Wormuth
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar GRANTING 193 the parties' Joint Motion to Dismiss (am)
May 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar DENYING 176 Plaintiff's Motion to Enter a Judgment; GRANTING IN PART 180 Defendant's Motion to Enforce the Settlement Agreement; and DENYING 190 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike (am)
May 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar TO SUBMIT Supplemental Authority no later than 12:00 p.m., noon, on May 21, 2018. (am)
February 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 169 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar DENYING 159 Plaintiff's Motion to Remand (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2) (am)
February 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 166 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar DENYING 157 Plaintiff's Motion for Clarification and DENYING 158 Plaintiff's Motion to Submit Theories of Liability not Pleaded (am)
January 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 146 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar GRANTING IN PART 139 Defendant's Motion in Limine. The Court reserves ruling on the portion of the motion that is not granted at this time. (am)
August 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 132 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART 94 Plaintiff Fowler's Motion for Reasonable Attorney's Fees and Costs pursuant to the Offer of Judgment and Acceptance (am)
July 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 130 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART 99 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment (am)
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 129 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar DENYING 100 Plaintiff's Motion to Exclude Defendant's Medical Expert and for Summary Judgment (am)
June 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER TO UNSEAL DOCUMENTS by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar. The Clerk is directed to unseal the filings listed herein. (am)
March 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar DENYING 108 Defendant's Motion to Strike and EXTENDING Defendant's reply deadline. Defendant's replies in support of 99 Motion for Summary Judgment and 97 Motion to Exclude are due by April 4, 2017. (sg)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith et al v. Auto-Owners Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melvin Smith
Represented By: Frederick H. Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stan Fowler
Represented By: Frederick H. Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Auto-Owners Insurance Company
Represented By: Jennifer G. Anderson
Represented By: Megan Muirhead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?