Payne v. Wilder et al
Plaintiff: Cara Payne
Defendant: Lee Wilder, Mayfritz Bucag and David Ceballes
Case Number: 2:2016cv00312
Filed: April 19, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Office: Las Cruces Office
County: Otero
Presiding Judge: Carmen E. Garza
Presiding Judge: Gregory J. Fouratt
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge James O. Browning granting Defendant Mayfritz Bucag's Motion for Summary Judgment on the Basis of Qualified Immunity 43 . (csg)
August 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge James O. Browning granting in part and denying in part Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment on the Basis of Qualified Immunity 38 . (csg)
July 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge James O. Browning, the Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment, filed November 26 is denied; and Defendant Mayfritz Bucag's Motion to Set aside Entry of Default, 35 is granted. The Court will set aside the Clerk's Entry of Default, 22 and allow Defendant Mayfritz Bucag to participate in this case free of default judgment against him. (meq)
January 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge James O. Browning granting 10 Defendant Ceballes Motion and Memorandum to Dismiss Plaintiffs Declaratory and Injunctive Relief Claims (meq)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Payne v. Wilder et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cara Payne
Represented By: Miguel Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee Wilder
Represented By: Damian L Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mayfritz Bucag
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Ceballes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?