Lough v. BNSF Railway Company

Plaintiff: Paul Lough
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company
Case Number: 2:2016cv00338
Filed: April 25, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Office: Las Cruces Office
County: Curry
Presiding Judge: Gregory J. Fouratt
Presiding Judge: Stephan M. Vidmar
Nature of Suit: Federal Employers Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 110 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge Judith C. Herrera granting 81 Plaintiff's Motion in Limine to Exclude Collateral Source Benefits Evidence; granting in part and denying in part 82 Defendant's Motion to Exclude the Expert T estimony of Plaintiff's Expert Alan Parkman; granting in part and denying in part 83 Defendant's Motion to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Plaintiff's Expert Terence Fischer; and denying 84 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. (baw)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar SETTING a Settlement Conference for Thursday, October 4, 2018, at 9:30 a.m. in Albuquerque - 421 Gold, ADR Suites 1 and 2. (jcm)
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar SETTING telephonic Status Conference for September 4, 2018, at 09:30 a.m. Counsel must call Judge Vidmar's Meet Me Line at 505-348-2357 to connect to the proceedings. (jcm)
June 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar GRANTING 68 Defendant's Motion to Extend Expert Disclosure Deadline. (sg)
August 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 STIPULATED ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar GRANTING 51 Joint Motion to Vacate Scheduling Deadlines, Vacate the Trial, and Stay the Case for 60 days. (am)
February 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 STIPULATED AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar. Discovery terminates July 17, 2017. Pretrial Motions due by August 16, 2017. Proposed Pretrial Order due to the Court by October 15, 2017. (sg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lough v. BNSF Railway Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Lough
Represented By: Anthony M. DiGiulio
Represented By: David Matthew Fine
Represented By: Charlotte Itoh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?