Beagles v. Watkins et al
Plaintiff: Eddie Beagles
Defendant: George Watkins, State of New Mexico Department of Workforce Solutions, Joel Saavedra and U.S. Department of Labor Wage and Hour Division
Case Number: 2:2016cv00506
Filed: June 1, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Office: Las Cruces Office
County: Otero
Presiding Judge: Carmen E. Garza
Presiding Judge: Kenneth J. Gonzales
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 FINAL JUDGMENT by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales. (tah)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting 38 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. Plaintiff's Reply is due to the Court on or before December 21, 2018. Defendant's Reply is due to the Court on or before January 11, 2019. (ag)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER Granting 36 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply by Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. Plaintiff's Reply is now due to the Court on or before 12/7/2018. Defendant's Reply is now due to the Court on or before 12/28/2018. (ag)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER setting Briefing Schedule by Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. (ag)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Setting Telephonic Status Conference for 9/25/2018 at 02:00 PM before Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. [Parties shall call Judge Garza's Meet Me line at (505) 348-2693 to be connected to the proceedings.] This line can only accommodate up to five telephone lines, including the Court's; if the parties anticipate that they will exceed this capacity, they must contact the Court immediately so that alternative arrangements may be made. (ag)
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 SUMMARY JUDGMENT by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales In favor of Defendant New Mexico Department of Workforce Solutions. (tah)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beagles v. Watkins et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eddie Beagles
Represented By: David L. Dotson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Watkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of New Mexico Department of Workforce Solutions
Represented By: Rudolph Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joel Saavedra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Labor Wage and Hour Division
Represented By: Manuel Lucero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?