Ortega v. Management and Training Corporation
Plaintiff: Alejandro Ortega
Defendant: Management and Training Corporation
Case Number: 2:2016cv00665
Filed: June 24, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Office: Las Cruces Office
County: Bernalillo
Presiding Judge: Carmen E. Garza
Presiding Judge: Stephan M. Vidmar
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar DENYING 47 Plaintiff's Motion to Quash and for Protective Order. (sg)
July 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 33 Defendant's Motion to Compel Discovery. (sg)
June 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 STIPULATED ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar GRANTING 40 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Third Extension of Scheduling Order. Discovery terminates July 25, 2017. Pretrial Motions are due by August 22, 2017. Proposed Pretrial Order is due to the Court by September 19, 2017. (am)
January 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar SETTING a Settlement Conference for May 3, 2017, at 9:00 a.m. in Las Cruces - 360 Doña Ana Courtroom. (sg)
January 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 17 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery. (sg)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ortega v. Management and Training Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alejandro Ortega
Represented By: Enrique Chavez, Jr.
Represented By: Miguel Luis Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Management and Training Corporation
Represented By: Krystle A Thomas
Represented By: Charles J. Vigil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?