Chile River, Inc. v. Lockhart Seeds, Inc.
Plaintiff: Chile River, Inc., Mark Franzoy and William Franzoy
Defendant: Lockhart Seeds, Inc.
Counter_claimant: Lockhart Seeds, Inc.
Counter_defendant: Chile River, Inc., Mark Franzoy and William Franzoy
Case Number: 2:2016cv00866
Filed: July 28, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Office: Las Cruces Office
County: Dona Ana
Presiding Judge: Gregory J. Fouratt
Presiding Judge: Kenneth J. Gonzales
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 150 STIPULATED ORDER DISMISSING CASE by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales. (tah)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 96 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. Discovery due by 12/2/2019. Expert Witness List due by 9/26/2019. Motions due by 12/16/2019. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 2/20/2020. (gbg)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales denying 44 Defendant Kamterter Products, LLC's Motion to Dismiss. (tah)
May 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 79 STIPULATED ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales extending deadline to file Reply in Support of Kamterter's Motion to Dismiss to and including 6/5/2018. (tah)
April 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt granting 58 Motion for Extension of Time. Supplemental Discovery due by 5/1/2018. Plaintiffs' Response due by 5/15/2018. Reply due by 5/29/2018. (kdj)
October 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales granting in part and denying in part 20 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs shall have until October 27, 2017, at 5:00 pm to file an Amended Complaint joining Kamterter II, LLC as a defendant. (tah)
August 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales granting 27 Opposed Motion to Vacate and Reset Hearing. Hearing on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(7) (Doc. 20) is reset for 9/14/2017 at 10:00 AM in Las Cruces. (tah)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chile River, Inc. v. Lockhart Seeds, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chile River, Inc.
Represented By: Casey S Stevenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Franzoy
Represented By: Casey S Stevenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Franzoy
Represented By: Casey S Stevenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lockhart Seeds, Inc.
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Lockhart Seeds, Inc.
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Dori Ellen Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Chile River, Inc.
Represented By: Casey S Stevenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Mark Franzoy
Represented By: Casey S Stevenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: William Franzoy
Represented By: Casey S Stevenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?