Hammonds et al v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Russell L Hammonds and Roberto Steve Rodriguez
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2016cv01230
Filed: November 9, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Office: Las Cruces Office
County: Dona Ana
Presiding Judge: Lourdes A. Martinez
Presiding Judge: Gregory B. Wormuth
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2671
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 88 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth granting 73 Motion for Summary Judgment. (bni)
September 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Oral Motion for Protective Order: by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea. (cbf)
April 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Lourdes A. Martinez. Amended Pleadings due by 6/12/2017. Discovery due by 9/1/2017. Joinder of Parties due by 6/12/2017. Pretrial Motions due by 10/23/2017. Proposed Pretrial Order due to the Court by 1/26/2018. (atc)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Lourdes A. Martinez. Joint Status Report due by 3/13/2017. Scheduling Conference set for 3/22/2017 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Lourdes A. Martinez. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 3/21/2017. (atc)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hammonds et al v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russell L Hammonds
Represented By: Albert Armendariz, Jr.
Represented By: Shane English
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roberto Steve Rodriguez
Represented By: Albert Armendariz, Jr.
Represented By: Shane English
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?