Salgado v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Adilaida Salgado
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2016cv01271
Filed: November 18, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Office: Las Cruces Office
County: Eddy
Presiding Judge: Lourdes A. Martinez
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea granting 20 Motion to Dismiss.(sls)
August 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea. Show Cause Response due by 9/5/2017.(sls)
July 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea. Briefing Schedule Filed 7/21/2017. Motion to Remand Due 8/17/2017. Response Due 9/18/2017. Reply Due 10/2/2017. (sls)
July 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER TO SEAL ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea granting 15 Motion to Seal (sls)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Salgado v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adilaida Salgado
Represented By: Jeffrey Diamond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?