Ramirez v. Curry County Detention Center

Plaintiff: Chris Ramirez
Defendant: Curry County Detention Center
Case Number: 2:2017cv00023
Filed: January 5, 2017
Court: New Mexico District Court
Office: Las Cruces Office
County: Curry
Presiding Judge: Robert A. Junell
Referring Judge: Stephan M. Vidmar
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 27, 2017 7 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge Robert A. Junell dismissing the 1 Complaint without prejudice; Plaintiff is granted leave to file an amended complaint within 30 days of entry of this order. (mjr)
June 26, 2017 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar GRANTING 3 Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. Plaintiff must make an initial partial payment or show cause why payment should be excused within 30 days. (sg)
February 27, 2017 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar. Plaintiff's Show-Cause Response is due by March 29, 2017. (sg)
January 11, 2017 2 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to Cure Deficiency by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar. Plaintiff must pay the filing fee or file an Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs no later than February 10, 2017. (sg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramirez v. Curry County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curry County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?