Valenzuela v. Board of Directors of the Southwest Solid Waste Authority
Plaintiff: Matthew Valenzuela
Defendant: Board of Directors of the Southwest Solid Waste Authority
Case Number: 2:2017cv00264
Filed: February 27, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Office: Las Cruces Office
County: Grant
Presiding Judge: Lourdes A. Martinez
Presiding Judge: Gregory B. Wormuth
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER SETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea. Settlement Conference set for 8/10/2017 at 09:00 AM in Las Cruces - 480 Picacho Courtroom (South Tower) before Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea. (cbf)
April 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Lourdes A. Martinez. Amended Pleadings due by 6/12/2017. Discovery due by 10/12/2017. Joinder of Parties due by 6/12/2017. Pretrial Motions due by 11/24/2017. Proposed Pretrial Order due to the Court by 2/26/2018. (atc)
March 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Lourdes A. Martinez. Joint Status Report due by 3/29/2017. Scheduling Conference set for 4/12/2017 at 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Lourdes A. Martinez. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 4/3/2017. (atc)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Valenzuela v. Board of Directors of the Southwest Solid Waste Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Valenzuela
Represented By: Jim Foy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Directors of the Southwest Solid Waste Authority
Represented By: Tony F Ortiz
Represented By: Gabriela M. Stewart
Represented By: Eugene I. Zamora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?