Barrett v. Family Dollar Stores of New Mexico, Inc.
Plaintiff: Linda Barrett
Defendant: Family Dollar Stores of New Mexico, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2017cv00677
Filed: June 26, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Office: Las Cruces Office
County: Dona Ana
Presiding Judge: Carmen E. Garza
Presiding Judge: Gregory B. Wormuth
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER to Submit Closing Documents and Vacating Settlement Conference by Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. (atc)
May 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. A Telephonic Status Conference is set for 8/2/2018 at 02:00 PM before Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. [Parties shall call Judge Garza's Meet Me line at 505.348.2 693 to be connected to the proceedings.] This line can only accommodate up to five telephone lines, including the Court's; if the parties anticipate that they will exceed this capacity, they must contact the Court immediately so that alternative arrangements may be made. A Settlement Conference is set for 8/14/2018 at 09:00 AM in Las Cruces - 460 Organ Courtroom (South Tower) before Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. (atc)
March 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Setting Telephonic Status Conference for 5/7/2018 at 02:00 PM before Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. [Parties shall call Judge Garza's Meet Me line at 505.348.2693 to be connected to the proceedings.] This line can only accommodate up to five telephone lines, including the Court's; if the parties anticipate that they will exceed this capacity, they must contact the Court immediately so that alternative arrangements may be made. (atc)
January 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. Joint Status Report is due by 3/5/2018. A Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 3/12/2018 at 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. [Pa rties shall call Judge Garza's Meet Me line at 505.348.2693 to be connected to the proceedings.] This line can only accommodate up to five telephone lines, including the Court's; if the parties anticipate that they will exceed this capacity, they must contact the Court immediately so that alternative arrangements may be made. (atc)
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Vacating Rule 16 Scheduling Conference by Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. (atc)
August 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. Joint Status Report due by 9/5/2017. Telephonic Rule 16 Hearing set for 9/12/2017 at 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. [The parties shall call Ju dge Garza's Meet Me line at 505.348.2693 to be connected to the proceedings.] This line can only accommodate up to five telephone lines, including the Court's; if the parties anticipate that they will exceed this capacity, they must contact the Court immediately so that alternative arrangements may be made. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 9/1/2017. (atc)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barrett v. Family Dollar Stores of New Mexico, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Barrett
Represented By: Jared Abrams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Family Dollar Stores of New Mexico, Inc.
Represented By: Andres E. Almanzan
Represented By: Monica L. Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?