Young v. GreatCall, Inc.
Plaintiff: Terry L. Young
Defendant: GreatCall, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2017cv00692
Filed: June 30, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Office: Las Cruces Office
County: Curry
Presiding Judge: Kevin R. Sweazea
Presiding Judge: Gregory B. Wormuth
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea granting in part and denying in part 78 Plaintiff's Second Motion to Compel (cbf)
March 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea granting in part and denying in part 37 Motion to Compel and 45 Motion for Protective Order (cbf)
February 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea Vacating 38 Order to Show Cause and Directing Defendant to Respond to Motion to Compel. (cbf)
August 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Setting Settlement Conference by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea. Settlement Conference set for 1/30/2018 at 09:00 AM in Las Cruces - 480 Picacho Courtroom (South Tower) before Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea. (cbf)
July 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea. Telephonic Rule 16 Conference set for 8/24/2017 at 03:30 PM. The parties shall call Judge Sweazea's "meet me" line, (505) 348-2694, to connect to the proceedings. Alterna tively, the parties may appear in person by following the the instructions in the order. Joint Status Report due by 8/14/2017. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 8/2/2017. (cbf)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Young v. GreatCall, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry L. Young
Represented By: Carlos E Sedillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GreatCall, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Croasdell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?