Coffey v. City of Clovis et al
Plaintiff: |
Justin Coffey |
Defendant: |
City of Clovis, Clovis Police Department and Albert Sena |
Case Number: |
2:2017cv00709 |
Filed: |
July 7, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of New Mexico |
Office: |
Las Cruces Office |
County: |
Curry |
Presiding Judge: |
Carmen E. Garza |
Presiding Judge: |
Stephan M. Vidmar |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Defendant |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
February 26, 2018 |
Filing
32
ORDER to Submit Closing Documents by Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. Closing documents are due to the Court no later than 3/26/18. (atc)
|
January 9, 2018 |
Filing
30
ORDER Resetting Settlement Conference by Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. A Telephonic Status Conference is set for 2/27/2018 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. [Parties shall call Judge Garza's Meet Me line at 505.348.2693 to be connected to the proceedings.] This line can only accommodate up to five telephone lines, including the Court's; if the parties anticipate that they will exceed this capacity, they must contact the Court immediately so that alternative arrangements may be made. The Settlement Conference is RESET for 3/6/2018 at 09:00 AM in Las Cruces - 460 Organ Courtroom (South Tower) before Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. (atc)
|
January 4, 2018 |
Filing
28
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. A Telephonic Status Conference is set for 2/27/2018 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. [Parties shall call Judge Garza's Meet Me line at 505.348.2693 to be co nnected to the proceedings.] This line can only accommodate up to five telephone lines, including the Court's; if the parties anticipate that they will exceed this capacity, they must contact the Court immediately so that alternative arrangements may be made. A Settlement Conference is set for 3/5/2018 at 09:00 AM in Las Cruces - 460 Organ Courtroom (South Tower) before Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. (atc)
|
January 3, 2018 |
Filing
25
ORDER Setting Telephonic Status Conference for 1/4/2018 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. [Parties shall call Judge Garza's Meet Me line at 505.348.2693 to be connected to the proceedings.] This line can only accommodate up to five telephone lines, including the Court's; if the parties anticipate that they will exceed this capacity, they must contact the Court immediately so that alternative arrangements may be made. (atc)
|
November 14, 2017 |
Filing
23
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. A Telephonic Status Conference is set for 1/9/2018 at 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. [Parties shall call Judge Garza's Meet Me line at 505.348.2693 to be co nnected to the proceedings.] This line can only accommodate up to five telephone lines, including the Court's; if the parties anticipate that they will exceed this capacity, they must contact the Court immediately so that alternative arrangements may be made. A Settlement Conference is set for 1/16/2018 at 11:00 AM in Las Cruces - 460 Organ Courtroom (South Tower) before Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. (atc)
|
September 12, 2017 |
Filing
17
ORDER Setting Telephonic Status Conference for 11/14/2017 at 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. [The parties shall call Judge Garza's Meet Me line at 505.348.2693 to be connected to the proceedings.] This line can only accommodate up to five telephone lines, including the Court's; if the parties anticipate that they will exceed this capacity, they must contact the Court immediately so that alternative arrangements may be made. (atc)
|
July 20, 2017 |
Filing
6
INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. Joint Status Report due by 9/5/2017. A Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 9/12/2017 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. [The parties shall call Judge Garza's Meet Me line at 505.348.2693 to be connected to the proceedings.] This line can only accommodate up to five telephone lines, including the Court's; if the parties anticipate that they will exceed this capacity, they must contact the Court immediately so that alternative arrangements may be made. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 8/10/2017. (atc)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?