White v. Town of Hurley
Plaintiff: Don White
Defendant: Town of Hurley
Case Number: 2:2017cv00983
Filed: September 26, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Office: Las Cruces Office
County: Grant
Presiding Judge: Carmen E. Garza
Presiding Judge: Kevin R. Sweazea
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 56 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 34 Opposed MOTION to Exclude Testimony and Opinions of Plaintiff's Expert and granting 33 Opposed MOTION for Summary Judgment by District Judge James O. Browning. (vv)
July 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea granting 30 Motion to Quash and Strike Plaintiff's Document 24. (sls)
July 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea denying 26 Motion to Quash. (sls)
May 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea granting 21 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Plaintiff's discovery deadline regarding expert reports is extended to July 2, 2018, and Defendant's discovery deadline regarding expert reports is extended to August 16, 2018. (sls)
April 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea granting 19 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Plaintiff's discovery deadline regarding expert reports is extended to June 8, 2018, and Defendant's discovery deadline regarding expert reports is extended to July 23, 2018. (sls)
February 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea. Discovery due by 7/2/2018. Discovery Motions due by 7/16/2018. Dispositive/All Other Motions due by 7/30/2018. Proposed Pretrial Order due to Court by 11/7/2018. (sls)
January 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER RESETTING RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea. A Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 2/1/2018 at 09:45 AM before Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea. (sls)
October 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea. Rule 16(c) Hearing set for 11/20/2017 at 09:45 AM in Las Cruces - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea. Joint Status Report due by 11/13/2017. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 11/13/2017. (sls)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White v. Town of Hurley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Don White
Represented By: Jim Foy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of Hurley
Represented By: Matthew Bullock
Represented By: Mark D. Jarmie
Represented By: Mark D Standridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?