Delgado v. State of New Mexico et al
Petitioner: Andrew Joey Delgado
Respondent: Raymond Smith
Case Number: 2:2017cv01004
Filed: October 4, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Office: Las Cruces Office
County: Lea
Presiding Judge: Kenneth J. Gonzales
Presiding Judge: Kevin R. Sweazea
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales Denying 1 Petition for 2254 Relief filed by Andrew Joey Delgado ; Denying 13 ORDER on Motion for Order; Denying 19 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; and Adopting Report and Recommendations re 22 Report and Recommendations. (jjs)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea re 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus; 13 Motion for Status Conference; & 19 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Objections to R&R due by August 28, 2019. Add 3 days to the deadline if service is by mailing it to the person's last known address (or means described in Fed. R. Civ. P. 5(b)(2)(D) and (F)); if service is by electronic means, no additional days are added. (Fed. R. Civ. P. 6(d); Fed. R. Crim. P. 45(c).) (cbf)
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, and directing Respondent to answer. (cbf)
October 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales. (tah)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Delgado v. State of New Mexico et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Andrew Joey Delgado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Raymond Smith
Represented By: Jane Bernstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?