Ellis et al v. Hobbs Police Department et al
Plaintiff: Brandon Ellis, Jeremy Artis and Vasshawn Robinson
Defendant: Hobbs Police Department, Jason Herrera, Chad Wright, Shane Blevins, Jeremy Kirk, Matthew Burleson, Jimmy Grimes, Christopher McCall and J.J. Murphy
Case Number: 2:2017cv01011
Filed: October 5, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Office: Las Cruces Office
County: Lea
Presiding Judge: Stephan M. Vidmar
Presiding Judge: Gregory B. Wormuth
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 258 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge Kea W. Riggs. The 189 Motion in Limine to Exclude Expert Testimony and Report of Robert L. Stewart in Limine is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. (ve)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 256 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge Kea W. Riggs. The 188 Motion in Limine is DENIED. (ve)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 255 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge Kea W. Riggs. The 191 Motion in Limine is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. (ve)
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 254 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge Kea W. Riggs. The 190 Motion to Strike Supplemental Expert Witness Report of William E. Foote, PHD, ABFP is DENIED. (ve)
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 253 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge Kea W. Riggs. The 186 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED IN PART and GRANTED IN PART. Count I survives against the City of Hobbs, HPD and Chief McCall in his official capacity. Plaintiffs First Ame ndment claim (Count II) survives against Chief McCall in his individual and official capacity, and Herrera. Finally, as to Count III, Plaintiffs § 1981 racial harassment and disparate treatment claims survive against Defendants McCall and Herrera. Plaintiff Ellis claims against the other individual Defendants are dismissed. (ve)
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 245 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge Kea W. Riggs. Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment 187 is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Count I survives against the City of Hobbs or Chief McCall in his official capacity. Plaintiffs First Ame ndment claim survives (Count II) against HPD, Chief McCall,Wright, and Kirk. Finally, as to Count III, Plaintiffs § 1981 racial harassment claim survives against Defendants HPD, McCall, Wright, and Kirk, but his disparate treatment claim is dismissed. (ve)
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 244 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge Kea W. Riggs. Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment 185 is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Plaintiffs First Amendment Association claim is dismissed, but the Court does not rule on the viability of any First Amendment Speech claim (Count II). Finally, Plaintiffs claims under Count III are dismissed. (ve)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 236 PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDED DISPOSITION re 163 Opposed MOTION for Sanctions by Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth. Objections to PFRD due by 3/18/2020. (ts)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth granting 177 Motion to Compel Zia Consulting, Inc. to Produce Plaintiffs' Records. (ts)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth granting 161 Motion to Quash Subpoena and for Protective Order. (ts)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth granting 151 Motion for Protective Order. (ts)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth granting in part and denying in part 131 Motion to Compel. (ts)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth granting 132 Motion to Compel. (ts)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth denying 67 Motion to Compel Defendant McCall's Responses to Written Discovery. (ts)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER TO PRESERVE digital evidence by Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth. (ts)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth denying 48 Motion for Protective Order. (ts)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ellis et al v. Hobbs Police Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Ellis
Represented By: Shannon L Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Artis
Represented By: Shannon L Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vasshawn Robinson
Represented By: Shannon L Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hobbs Police Department
Represented By: Marcus J Rael, Jr
Represented By: Luis E. Robles
Represented By: David Anthony Roman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Herrera
Represented By: Marcus J Rael, Jr
Represented By: Luis E. Robles
Represented By: David Anthony Roman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Wright
Represented By: Marcus J Rael, Jr
Represented By: Luis E. Robles
Represented By: David Anthony Roman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shane Blevins
Represented By: Marcus J Rael, Jr
Represented By: Luis E. Robles
Represented By: David Anthony Roman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremy Kirk
Represented By: Marcus J Rael, Jr
Represented By: Luis E. Robles
Represented By: David Anthony Roman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Burleson
Represented By: Marcus J Rael, Jr
Represented By: Luis E. Robles
Represented By: David Anthony Roman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jimmy Grimes
Represented By: Marcus J Rael, Jr
Represented By: Luis E. Robles
Represented By: David Anthony Roman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher McCall
Represented By: Marcus J Rael, Jr
Represented By: Luis E. Robles
Represented By: David Anthony Roman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.J. Murphy
Represented By: Marcus J Rael, Jr
Represented By: Luis E. Robles
Represented By: David Anthony Roman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?